Park v. E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jae Hyun Park
Defendant: E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC and Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00069
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration. Defendants' reply shall be due June 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/02/2023. (rsg)
June 2, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jae Hyun Park re #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (rsg)
May 31, 2023 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC. (Bowness, Matthew) Modified on 5/31/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cory Hohnbaum for Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/25/2023. (sk)
May 25, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Cory Hohnbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12622554) Attorney Cory Hohnbaum added appearing on behalf of Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. (djs)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Respond to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Amended Complaint. Defendant FINRA's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction is on or before June 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/24/2023. (rsg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Cory Hohnbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12622554).by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Matthews, Logan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jae Hyun Park. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jae Hyun Park, #2 Exhibit A-B)(rsg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Matthews, Logan) Modified on 5/24/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
May 24, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jae Hyun Park re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (rsg)
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent ETCM Holdings LLC for E-Trade Securities, LLC. (Bowness, Matthew)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Arbitration and to Dismiss Action with Brief In Support by E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action, #2 Affidavit of Erik Renga, #3 Exhibit 1 to Renga Declaration (Transfer Letter), #4 Exhibit 2 to Renga Declaration (2017 Agreement), #5 Exhibit 3 to Renga Declaration (2023 Agreement))(Bowness, Matthew) . Added MOTION to Dismiss on 5/18/2023 (ddm).
May 2, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. filed by Jae Hyun Park. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 2, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Jae Hyun Park. E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, and Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. served on 4/20/2023, answers due 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 E-trade Solutions, #2 Financial Industry Regulatory Authority)(rsg)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
April 24, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jae Hyun Park re #4 Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order. (sk)
April 17, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ddm)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Jae Hyun Park. (ddm)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jae Hyun Park. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 2-000092) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 17, 2023 Submission of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (ddm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jae Hyun Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Trade Financial Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Jack Bowness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Trade Securities, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jack Bowness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Represented By: Cory Hohnbaum
Represented By: Logan T. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?