United States of America v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 1.80 Acre of Land, More of Less, in Fannin County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 1.80 Acre of Land, More of Less, in Fannin County, Georgia, Roger McTaggart, Glenda McTaggart and Candy Watkins Patterson
Case Number: 2:2023cv00250
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 0831 Actions re: rights of Tennessee Valley Authority
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2024 Filing 13 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4-1-24 through 4-5-24, 5-23-24 through 5-31-24, 6-14-24 through 7-5-24, by Michael H. Cummings, II. (Cummings, Michael)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/09/2024. (ddm)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Glenda McTaggart, Roger McTaggart.(Cummings, Michael)
January 5, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Glenda McTaggart, Roger McTaggart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer of Glenda McTaggart, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Answer of Glenda McTaggart)(Cummings, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Glenda McTaggart, Roger McTaggart. Discovery ends on 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer of Roger McTaggart, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Answer of Roger McTaggart)(Cummings, Michael) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 2, 2024 Submission of #7 MOTION Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession , to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of December 18, 2023 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Roger McTaggart, #2 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Glenda McTaggart, #3 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Candy Watkins Patterson)(Chase, James)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Possession, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession)(Chase, James)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
December 4, 2023 Funds Deposited per #5 Order: $ 37,000.00 receipt number 200000212. (ddm)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/30/2023. (ddm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Directing Deposit of Funds, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Deposit of Funds)(Chase, James) Modified on 11/29/2023 to edit docket text (ddm).
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Property Description)(ddm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION OF TAKING filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Map)(ddm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Property Description, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 1.80 Acre of Land, More of Less, in Fannin County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S. Chase
Represented By: Lamont A. Belk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-Of-Way Over 1.80 Acre of Land, More of Less, in Fannin County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger McTaggart
Represented By: Michael H. Cummings, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda McTaggart
Represented By: Michael H. Cummings, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Watkins Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?