Enlow et al v. Alexander et al
Plaintiff: Terri Enlow
Defendant: Chad Wille, Regina Brown Alexander and Brian Phillip Karki
Case Number: 3:2018cv00121
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Regina Brown Alexander Answer due 1/7/2019; Brian Phillip Karki Answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/3/18. (usw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Consent Motion Extending Time to File Answers and Defensive Pleadings by Regina Brown Alexander, Brian Phillip Karki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Second Consent Order Extending Time to File Answers and Defensive Pleadings)(Mozley, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants Alexander and Karli only by Terri Enlow(Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Daniel Enlow), Terri Enlow(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Daniel Enlow, Deceased) (Hinson, Darrell)
November 15, 2018 Clerks Entry of Default as to Chad Wille. (jlm)
November 15, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 Notice of Filing. Document re-docketed as document #10 using correct event, Return of Service Executed. (jlm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Terri Enlow (Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Daniel Enlow), Terri Enlow(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Daniel Enlow, Deceased). Chad Wille served on 10/20/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (jlm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendant Wille by Terri Enlow, Terri Enlow. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of counsel)(Hinson, Darrell)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Re-docketed at #10 using correct event (NOTICE Of Filing Proof of Service of Defendant Wille by Terri Enlow(Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Daniel Enlow), Terri Enlow(as Surviving Spouse of Larry Daniel Enlow, Deceased) (Hinson, Darrell) Modified on 11/15/2018 (jlm).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Regina Brown Alexander Answer due 12/7/2018; Brian Phillip Karki Answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/9/18. (jlm)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Defensive Pleadings by Regina Brown Alexander, Brian Phillip Karki.(Mozley, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Defensive Pleadings by Regina Brown Alexander, Brian Phillip Karki. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Consent Order Extending Time to File Answers and Defensive Pleadings)(Mozley, John)
October 31, 2018 MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Callahan; granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick H. Dekle. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/31/18. (se)
October 26, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick H. Dekle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8219374). Attorney Patrick H. Dekle added appearing on behalf of Terri Enlow, Terri Enlow (pmb)
October 24, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Callahan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8216642). Attorney Michael Callahan added appearing on behalf of Terri Enlow, Terri Enlow (pmb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Patrick H. Dekle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8219374)by Terri Enlow, Terri Enlow. (Hinson, Darrell)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Callahan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8216642)by Terri Enlow. (Hinson, Darrell)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Regina Brown Alexander and (Attachments: #1 Summons - Karli, #2 Summons - Wille)(rsh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Terri Enlow (Personal Representative of the Estate of Larry Daniel Enlow). (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-820415) (Attachments: #1 Exh 1 Enlow Letters, #2 Exh 2 Alexander Letters, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enlow et al v. Alexander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Brown Alexander
Represented By: John Arthur Mozley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Phillip Karki
Represented By: John Arthur Mozley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Enlow
Represented By: Darrell Wayne Hinson
Represented By: Patrick H. Dekle
Represented By: Michael Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?