Drane v. Ford
Petitioner: Leonard Maurice Drane
Respondent: Benjamin Ford
Case Number: 3:2018cv00150
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Scheduling Order. Petitioner shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to file any amendments to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent shall have 60 days thereafter in which to file an answer to the amended petition as well as any motion to dismiss Petitioners claims as procedurally defaulted. Petitioner shall have 60 days thereafter to file a response to Respondents procedural-default motion. Respondent shall then have 30 days to file his reply brief. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/13/2019. (usw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Scheduling Order by Benjamin Ford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Popoola, Omotayo)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Benjamin Ford.(Popoola, Omotayo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (manual) (Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 225, #2 Exhibit 226, #3 Exhibit 227, #4 Exhibit 228, #5 Exhibit 229, #6 Exhibit 230, #7 Exhibit 231, #8 Exhibit 232, #9 Exhibit 233, #10 Exhibit 234, #11 Exhibit 235, #12 Exhibit 236, #13 Exhibit 237, #14 Exhibit 238, #15 Exhibit 239, #16 Exhibit 240, #17 Exhibit 241, #18 Exhibit 242, #19 Exhibit 243, #20 Exhibit 244, #21 Exhibit 245, #22 Exhibit 246, #23 Exhibit 247, #24 Exhibit 248, #25 Exhibit 249, #26 Exhibit 250, #27 Exhibit 251, #28 Exhibit 252, #29 Exhibit 253, #30 Exhibit 254, #31 Exhibit 255, #32 Exhibit 256, #33 Exhibit 257, #34 Exhibit 258, #35 Exhibit 259)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 184, #2 Exhibit 185, #3 Exhibit 186, #4 Exhibit 187, #5 Exhibit 188, #6 Exhibit 189, #7 Exhibit 190, #8 Exhibit 191, #9 Exhibit 192, #10 Exhibit 193, #11 Exhibit 194, #12 Exhibit 195, #13 Exhibit 196, #14 Exhibit 197, #15 Exhibit 198, #16 Exhibit 199, #17 Exhibit 200, #18 Exhibit 201, #19 Exhibit 202, #20 Exhibit 203, #21 Exhibit 204, #22 Exhibit 205, #23 Exhibit 206, #24 Exhibit 207, #25 Exhibit 208, #26 Exhibit 209, #27 Exhibit 210, #28 Exhibit 211, #29 Exhibit 212, #30 Exhibit 213, #31 Exhibit 214, #32 Exhibit 215, #33 Exhibit 216, #34 Exhibit 217, #35 Exhibit 218, #36 Exhibit 219, #37 Exhibit 220, #38 Exhibit 221, #39 Exhibit 222, #40 Exhibit 223, #41 Exhibit 224)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 143, #2 Exhibit 144, #3 Exhibit 145, #4 Exhibit 146, #5 Exhibit 147, #6 Exhibit 148, #7 Exhibit 149, #8 Exhibit 150, #9 Exhibit 151, #10 Exhibit 152, #11 Exhibit 153, #12 Exhibit 154, #13 Exhibit 155, #14 Exhibit 156, #15 Exhibit 157, #16 Exhibit 158, #17 Exhibit 159, #18 Exhibit 160, #19 Exhibit 161, #20 Exhibit 162, #21 Exhibit 163, #22 Exhibit 164, #23 Exhibit 165, #24 Exhibit 166, #25 Exhibit 167, #26 Exhibit 168, #27 Exhibit 169, #28 Exhibit 170, #29 Exhibit 171, #30 Exhibit 172, #31 Exhibit 173, #32 Exhibit 174, #33 Exhibit 175, #34 Exhibit 176, #35 Exhibit 177, #36 Exhibit 178, #37 Exhibit 179, #38 Exhibit 180, #39 Exhibit 181, #40 Exhibit 182, #41 Exhibit 183)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 95, #2 Exhibit 96, #3 Exhibit 97, #4 Exhibit 98, #5 Exhibit 99, #6 Exhibit 100, #7 Exhibit 101, #8 Exhibit 102, #9 Exhibit 103, #10 Exhibit 104, #11 Exhibit 105, #12 Exhibit 106, #13 Exhibit 107, #14 Exhibit 108, #15 Exhibit 109, #16 Exhibit 110, #17 Exhibit 111, #18 Exhibit 112, #19 Exhibit 113, #20 Exhibit 114, #21 Exhibit 115, #22 Exhibit 116, #23 Exhibit 117, #24 Exhibit 118, #25 Exhibit 119, #26 Exhibit 120, #27 Exhibit 121, #28 Exhibit 122, #29 Exhibit 123, #30 Exhibit 124, #31 Exhibit 125, #32 Exhibit 126, #33 Exhibit 127, #34 Exhibit 128, #35 Exhibit 129, #36 Exhibit 130, #37 Exhibit 131, #38 Exhibit 132, #39 Exhibit 133, #40 Exhibit 134, #41 Exhibit 135, #42 Exhibit 136, #43 Exhibit 137, #44 Exhibit 138, #45 Exhibit 139, #46 Exhibit 140, #47 Exhibit 141, #48 Exhibit 142)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55, #3 Exhibit 56, #4 Exhibit 57, #5 Exhibit 58, #6 Exhibit 59, #7 Exhibit 60, #8 Exhibit 61, #9 Exhibit 62, #10 Exhibit 63, #11 Exhibit 64, #12 Exhibit 65, #13 Exhibit 66, #14 Exhibit 67, #15 Exhibit 68, #16 Exhibit 69, #17 Exhibit 70, #18 Exhibit 71, #19 Exhibit 72, #20 Exhibit 73, #21 Exhibit 74, #22 Exhibit 75, #23 Exhibit 76, #24 Exhibit 77, #25 Exhibit 78, #26 Exhibit 79, #27 Exhibit 80, #28 Exhibit 81, #29 Exhibit 82, #30 Exhibit 83, #31 Exhibit 84, #32 Exhibit 85, #33 Exhibit 86, #34 Exhibit 87, #35 Exhibit 88, #36 Exhibit 89, #37 Exhibit 90, #38 Exhibit 91, #39 Exhibit 92, #40 Exhibit 93, #41 Exhibit 94)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Exhibit 26, #9 Exhibit 27, #10 Exhibit 28, #11 Exhibit 29, #12 Exhibit 30, #13 Exhibit 31, #14 Exhibit 32, #15 Exhibit 33, #16 Exhibit 34, #17 Exhibit 35, #18 Exhibit 36, #19 Exhibit 37, #20 Exhibit 38, #21 Exhibit 39, #22 Exhibit 40, #23 Exhibit 41, #24 Exhibit 42, #25 Exhibit 43, #26 Exhibit 44, #27 Exhibit 45, #28 Exhibit 46, #29 Exhibit 47, #30 Exhibit 48, #31 Exhibit 49, #32 Exhibit 50, #33 Exhibit 51, #34 Exhibit 52, #35 Exhibit 53)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing by Benjamin Ford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Popoola, Omotayo)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 01/02/2019. c:Financial Office(usw)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Omotayo "Tayo" Popoola on behalf of Benjamin Ford (Popoola, Omotayo)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina D. Graham on behalf of Benjamin Ford (Graham, Sabrina)
December 21, 2018 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (rsh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leonard Maurice Drane. (rsh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Capital Habeas Corpus filed by Leonard Maurice Drane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification) (rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2018: #3 Exh A) (rsh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drane v. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard Maurice Drane
Represented By: Jonathan R. Chally
Represented By: Gerald Wesley King, Jr.
Represented By: L. Joseph Loveland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Benjamin Ford
Represented By: Omotayo "Tayo&quot Popoola
Represented By: Sabrina D. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?