Ransom et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John Ransom, Jr. and Cheryl Ransom
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00048
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by United States of America. Discovery ends on 12/11/2019.(Swietlik, Amanda) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cheryl Ransom, John Ransom, Jr (Podesta, Frank)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General and (Attachments: #1 Summons - IRS Commissioner, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney)(rsh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Ransom, Jr., Cheryl Ransom. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8667788) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ransom, Jr.
Represented By: Frank G. Podesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ransom
Represented By: Frank G. Podesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Amanda Joyce Swietlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?