PayCargo,LLC v. CargoSprint, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PayCargo,LLC
Defendant: Joshua Wolf and CargoSprint, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00085
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER re #22 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters on order on the pending motion to dismiss. Discovery shall begin 30 days after the Answer is filed and shall continue for 8 months. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/07/2019. (usw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by PayCargo,LLC. (Fort, Ann)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by PayCargo,LLC. (Fort, Ann)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REVISED ORDER. Plaintiff PayCargo, LLC shall file its response on or before 09/24/2019 and Defendants Cargo Sprint LLC and Joshua Wolf shall file a reply or answer to PayCargo's response or amended pleading on or before 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 09/23/2019. (usw)
September 19, 2019 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward Steele Clayton IV; granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael G. Dashefsky; granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Virginia M. Yetter; granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Dale Grimes. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/19/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(se)
September 19, 2019 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 9/18/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's #11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff PayCargo, LLC shall file its response on or before 09/24/2019 and Defendants CargoSprint LLC and Joshua Wolf shall file a reply or answer to PayCargo's response or amended pleading on or before 09/31/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 09/17/2019. (usw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [D.E. 11] by PayCargo,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fort, Ann)
September 13, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael G. Dashefsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921043). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Michael G. Dashefsky added appearing on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (pmb)
September 13, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Virginia M. Yetter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921045). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Virginia M. Yetter added appearing on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (pmb)
September 13, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Dale Grimes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921046). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney R. Dale Grimes added appearing on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (pmb)
September 13, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Steele Clayton, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921042). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Edward Steele Clayton, IV added appearing on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (pmb)
September 11, 2019 Clerks Approval re #17 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 8921044. (Gunter, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Dale Grimes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921046). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Virginia M. Yetter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921045). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael G. Dashefsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921043). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Steele Clayton, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8921042). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Instructions To Parties and Counsel, signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 09/09/2019.(usw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted with Brief In Support by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Gunter, Justin)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Joint Motion To Extend Deadline to Respond. CargoSprint, LLC. The deadline for Defendants to file answers or other responsive pleadings is hereby extended through and including 09/03/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/21/2019. (usw)
August 19, 2019 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Gunter, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Gunter on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (Gunter, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George Wayne Hillis, Jr on behalf of CargoSprint, LLC, Joshua Wolf (Hillis, George)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by PayCargo,LLC Proof of Service on CargoSprint LLC (Fort, Ann)
July 23, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by PayCargo,LLC. (Fort, Ann)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to CargoSprint, LLC. (usw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joshua Wolf. (usw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8804097) filed by PayCargo,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CargoSprint, LLC, #3 Summons Joshua Wolf)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayCargo,LLC v. CargoSprint, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Wolf
Represented By: Michael G. Dashefsky
Represented By: George Wayne Hillis, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Steele Clayton, IV
Represented By: R. Dale Grimes
Represented By: Justin Gunter
Represented By: Virginia M. Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CargoSprint, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Dashefsky
Represented By: George Wayne Hillis, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Steele Clayton, IV
Represented By: R. Dale Grimes
Represented By: Justin Gunter
Represented By: Virginia M. Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayCargo,LLC
Represented By: Ann Grunewald Fort
Represented By: Cameron C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?