Greathouse v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Greathouse
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00099
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 3:19-cv-00099-RGV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (usw)
October 4, 2019 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Tammy S. Greathouse. (Scott, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Tammy S. Greathouse. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 8/21/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Atty Gen., #2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, #3 Summons Office of Reg. Chief Counsel IV)(Scott, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (usw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (usw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of Chief Regional Counsel. (usw)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING that plaintiff's counsel arrange for the service ofprocess on the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 08/13/2019. (usw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Tammy S. Greathouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Atty General, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons Office of Chief Regional Counsel)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 08/13/2019.
August 13, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rsh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tammy S. Greathouse. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons - OCG, #3 Summons - US Atty Genl, #4 Summons - US Atty, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greathouse v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Greathouse
Represented By: Christopher Bryan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?