A.P. v. Fayette County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: A.P.
Defendant: Fayette County Board of Education, Dr. Joseph Barrow, Jr., Dr. Brandi Johnson, Dr. Dan Lane and Dr. Curtis Armour, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00109
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1683
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric J. Artrip; granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teresa Ryder Mastando; granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Adaku Onyeka-Crawford; granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily Martin; granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Hazuka; granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neena Chaudhry. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/21/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(se)
October 10, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Neena Chaudhry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Neena Chaudhry added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
October 10, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Hazuka Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Margaret Hazuka added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
October 10, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Martin Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Emily Martin added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
October 10, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Adaku Onyeka-Crawford Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Adaku Onyeka-Crawford added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission of Neena Chaudhry Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Hazuka Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Martin Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Adaku Onyeka-Crawford Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
October 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric J. Artrip Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8957661). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Eric J. Artrip added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
October 2, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Teresa Ryder Mastando Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8957676). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Teresa Ryder Mastando added appearing on behalf of A.P. (pmb)
September 27, 2019 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954649). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
September 27, 2019 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Hazuka Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954664). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correctio re: Courts. (cdg)
September 27, 2019 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Neena Chaudhry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954696). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
September 27, 2019 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Adaku Onyeka-Crawford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954620). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: Courts. (cdg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Teresa Ryder Mastando Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8957676). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric J. Artrip Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8957661). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Neena Chaudhry Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954696). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Margaret Hazuka Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954664). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954649). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Adaku Onyeka-Crawford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8954620). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by A.P.. (Cole, Alexandra)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants Answer due on or before 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 09/13/2019. (usw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Curtis Armour, Jr., Joseph Barrow, Jr., Fayette County Board of Education, Brandi Johnson, Dan Lane. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Hieu)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by A.P.. Fayette County Board of Education served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Penn, Darren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by A.P.. Joseph Barrow, Jr. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Penn, Darren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by A.P.. Curtis Armour, Jr. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Penn, Darren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by A.P.. Brandi Johnson served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Penn, Darren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by A.P.. Dan Lane served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Penn, Darren)
August 28, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 First Certificate of Interested Persons by A.P.. (Penn, Darren)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brandi Johnson. (usw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Curtis Armour, Jr. (usw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dan Lane. (usw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joseph Barrow, Jr.. (usw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Fayette County Board of Education. (usw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8886250) filed by A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Fayette County Board of Education, #3 Summons Dr. Joseph Barrow, Jr., #4 Summons Dr. Dan Lane, #5 Summons Dr. Curtis Armour, Jr., #6 Summons Dr. Brandi Johnson)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.P. v. Fayette County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette County Board of Education
Represented By: Hieu Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph Barrow, Jr.
Represented By: Hieu Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brandi Johnson
Represented By: Hieu Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dan Lane
Represented By: Hieu Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Curtis Armour, Jr.
Represented By: Hieu Minh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.
Represented By: Darren W. Penn
Represented By: Alexandra Cole
Represented By: Margaret Hazuka
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Eric J. Artrip
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Represented By: Emily Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?