A Global Ministry Care, Inc. v. Residential Assets Mortgage Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A Global Ministry Care, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Residential Assets Mortgage Products, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amendend Complaint filed by A Global Ministry Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit B - QD, #4 Exhibit C - QD, #5 Exhibit D - WD, #6 Exhibit E - Assignment, #7 Exhibit F - Assignment, #8 Exhibit G - Assignment, #9 Exhibit H -, #10 Exhibit I -, #11 Exhibit J -, #12 Exhibit K - plat, #13 Exhibit Lis Pendens)(Grimes, KaRon)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Security Deed, #3 Exhibit B -- Assignments, #4 Exhibit C -- Deed Under Power, #5 Exhibit D -- Pleadings in Prior Action, #6 Exhibit E -- MSJ Order in Prior Action, #7 Exhibit F -- Appellate Docket and Ruling, #8 Exhibit G -- Notice of Sale Under Power)(Kearns, John)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI Answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 09/26/2019. (usw)
September 10, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Kearns, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Quite Title and Injunctive Relief by A Global Ministry Care, Inc. (usw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Appointment of Special Master by A Global Ministry Care, Inc. (usw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8918717) filed by DOES 1-10, Residential Assets Mortgage Products, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents Served on Trustee, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Records, #3 Exhibit C - Security Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Tax Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(usw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A Global Ministry Care, Inc. v. Residential Assets Mortgage Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Assets Mortgage Products, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-EFCI
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Global Ministry Care, Inc.
Represented By: KaRon L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?