Ndengey v. PHH Mortgage Service et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ndengey
Defendant: Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service and Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
April 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #11 Clerk's Judgment. (dmb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #10 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Stay. (dmb)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss as unopposed; denying as moot #6 Motion to Stay. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/14/2020. (dmb)
April 14, 2020 Submission of #6 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #9 Notice (Other). (dmb)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #8 Order. (dmb)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service identifying Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service; Other Affiliate MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. f/k/a MERSCORP, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS) by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service.(Windham, Mark)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Windham, Mark)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS), Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Windham, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #4 Order. (usw)
March 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gabriel Ndengey re #3 Order on Motion for TRO. (rsh)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying as moot #2 Ndengey's Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/18/20. (rsh)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES WITH JUDGE BATTEN PRESIDING IN RE: Chambers Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19. The time for discovery in all cases in which discovery has already commenced or will commence prior to 4/16/2020 is extended by thirty days. The Court GRANTS an automatic 15-day extension for submission of proposed pretrial orders in cases where discovery has been closed and that are due on or before 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/18/20. (usw)
March 18, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb)
March 17, 2020 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 (TRO NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BGANDC-9481633) filed by Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al., PHH Mortgage Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ndengey v. PHH Mortgage Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ndengey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, et al.
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Service
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. (MERS)
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?