Bodiford et al v. Butz
Plaintiff: Quentin Bodiford and Amy Bodiford
Defendant: Alexander Davis Butz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00142
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively close the case. Theparties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the settlementdocuments. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties should promptlymove to reopen the case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/11/2020. (dmb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Christopher P. Janes. Clerk to follow-up by 9/10/2020. (nmb)
August 24, 2020 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alexander Davis Butz (Alfonso, Ashley)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Davis Butz identifying Corporate Parent Horace Mann Property & Casualty Insurance Company for Alexander Davis Butz. (Alfonso, Ashley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/19/2020. (dmb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Alexander Davis Butz. Discovery ends on 1/15/2021.(Alfonso, Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (rsh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 DEFENDANT DAVIS ALEXANDER BUTZ, IMPROPERLY NAMED AS ALEXANDER DAVIS BUTZ, NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10040202) filed by Alexander Davis Butz. (Attachments: #1 Exh A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exh B - Return of Service, #3 Exh C - Pre Suit Demands, #4 Notice of Removal (State Court), #5 Exh E - Troup County Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodiford et al v. Butz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Bodiford
Represented By: Christopher P. Janes
Represented By: John C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bodiford
Represented By: Christopher P. Janes
Represented By: John C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Davis Butz
Represented By: Riley William Snider
Represented By: Ashley Denise Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?