Wright v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Lavette M. Wright
Defendant: Brian P. Kemp, Denise Beckwith and Mark Butler
Case Number: 3:2020cv00143
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Service on named defendants by Lavette M. Wright. (jpa)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lavette M. Wright re #7 Notice (Other). (dmb)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lavette M. Wright re #6 Notice (Other). (rsh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lavette M. Wright re #5 Order. (rsh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER finding that Plaintiff's complaint is not frivolous and may proceed. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/31/2020. (dmb)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #4 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lavette M. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lavette M. Wright re #3 Order (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Service of Process shall not issue at present time. Case to be submitted ti District Judge for frivolity determination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/19/20. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Lavette M. Wright re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Order. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (rsh)
August 19, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (Submitted on IFP App Only) (rsh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavette M. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(rsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavette M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?