Andrews v. Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Phillip Andrews
Defendant: Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2020cv00146
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated from case. (dmb)
October 14, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (dmb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Phillip Andrews. (Lakraj, Adeash)
October 13, 2020 Submission of #10 Stipulation to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (dmb)
October 8, 2020 Submission of #10 Stipulation to Extend time to answer, with proposed order, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (rsh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION (Second Joint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint) by Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Gavin)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Asher Hoffman on behalf of Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership (Hoffman, Eric)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Stone Appleby on behalf of Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership (Appleby, Gavin)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint) by Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Gavin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Phillip Andrews. Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Lakraj, Adeash)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (rsh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership. (rsh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10050189) filed by Phillip Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freudenberg North America Limited Partnership
Represented By: Gavin Stone Appleby
Represented By: Eric Asher Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Andrews
Represented By: Adeash Amarnauth Lakraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?