Hutchinson v. Troup County, Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hutchinson
Defendant: Troup County, Georgia, Lindsay Fenn and Eric Mosley
Case Number: 3:2020cv00154
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against Lindsay Fenn, Eric Mosley, Troup County, Georgiawith Jury Demand filed by Tiffany Hutchinson.(Boring, Anne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tiffany Hutchinson. (Benjamin, Rachel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/30/2020. (dmb)
September 30, 2020 Clerks Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lindsay Fenn, Eric Mosley. (Mocek, Joyce)
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants Eric Mosley and Lindsay Fenn's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Lindsay Fenn, Eric Mosley.(Mocek, Joyce) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Troup County, GA's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Troup County, Georgia. Discovery ends on 2/26/2021.(Mocek, Joyce) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Lynn Freesmeier on behalf of Lindsay Fenn, Eric Mosley, Troup County, Georgia (Freesmeier, Hillary)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including 9/29/2020 for all defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/10/2020. (dmb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lindsay Fenn, Eric Mosley, Troup County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension)(Mocek, Joyce)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Tiffany Hutchinson. Lindsay Fenn served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Boring, Anne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Tiffany Hutchinson. Eric Mosley served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Boring, Anne)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Tiffany Hutchinson. Troup County, Georgia served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Boring, Anne)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (rsh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Eric Mosley. (rsh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lindsay Fenn. (rsh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Troup County, Georgia. (rsh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10061337) filed by Tiffany Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Troup County, Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troup County, Georgia
Represented By: Joyce F. Mocek
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Freesmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Fenn
Represented By: Joyce F. Mocek
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Freesmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Mosley
Represented By: Joyce F. Mocek
Represented By: Hillary Lynn Freesmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Hutchinson
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Wilson Clark
Represented By: Anne Boring
Represented By: Rachel Berlin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?