Howard v. Central Transport Company et al
Plaintiff: Herbert H. Howard
Defendant: Central Transport Company and Cherokee Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00141
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures by Central Transport Company, Cherokee Insurance Company.(Parrott, Jennifer)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 5.1(C) by Cherokee Insurance Company.(Parrott, Jennifer)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant Cherokee Insurance Company's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Cherokee Insurance Company.(Parrott, Jennifer) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 Defendant Central Transport LLC's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Central Transport Company.(Parrott, Jennifer) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and granting a 6-month discovery period. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/21/2021. (ddm)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se Plaintiff's PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Herbert H. Howard. (jkb)
September 21, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Herbert H. Howard re #13 Order. (ddm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Marshal's Entry of Service of State Court Summon by Herbert H. Howard (jkb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Central Transport Company, Cherokee Insurance Company.(Parrott, Jennifer)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Central Transport Company, Cherokee Insurance Company. (Parrott, Jennifer)
September 13, 2021 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 9/01/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Central Transport Company, Cherokee Insurance Company filed by Herbert H. Howard.(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Amended Complaint by Herbert H. Howard (jkb)
August 24, 2021 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number BGANDC-11199698. (Parrott, Jennifer)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 09/06/2021, 11/24-26/2021, 12/23-30/2021, 01/01-07/2021, by Jennifer E. Parrott. (Parrott, Jennifer) Modified docket text on 8/23/2021 (dmb).
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Company.(Parrott, Jennifer) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/20/2021. (dmb)
August 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Herbert H. Howard re #4 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. (dmb)
August 20, 2021 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Oakland Financial Corporation for Cherokee Insurance Company. (ayw)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 1/18/2022.(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Central Transport Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BGANDC-11199698) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit General Civil and Domestic Relations Case Filing, #4 Exhibit Summons (Central Transport), #5 Exhibit Summons (Cherokee Insurance), #6 Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Central Transport Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Transport Company
Represented By: Jennifer E. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary McGinty
Represented By: Jennifer E. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?