Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Benjamin Hugh Johnson, Margaret Liles Johnson, Roland T. Disinger and Nancy K. Disinger
Case Number: 3:2023cv00179
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 18 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/9/2023. (dmb)
November 7, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
November 3, 2023 Filing 17 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 20 - November 27, 2023, December 25, 2023 - January 2, 2024, by Melissa Kaye Kahren. (Kahren, Melissa)
November 3, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Hugh Johnson, Margaret Liles Johnson. (Conerly, Charles)
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Benjamin Hugh Johnson, Margaret Liles Johnson. Discovery ends on 4/1/2024.(Conerly, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 30, 2023 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (dmb)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Disinger Defendants filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company (Kahren, Melissa)
October 25, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kahren, Melissa)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Nancy K. Disinger and Roland T. Disinger Answer due 11/6/2023. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/24/2023. (dmb)
October 23, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Nancy K. Disinger, Roland T. Disinger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quillian, Henry)
October 9, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. Benjamin Hugh Johnson served on 10/6/2023; Margaret Liles Johnson served on 10/6/2023. (Kahren, Melissa)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kahren, Melissa)
October 4, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kahren, Melissa)
October 2, 2023 Refund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 9/21/2023 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 21, 2023 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-12884805. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment of Receipts)(Kahren, Melissa)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Home-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Property-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Southern-Owners Insurance Company for Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kahren, Melissa)
September 20, 2023 Clerk's Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Court Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nancy K. Disinger. (jkb)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Roland T. Disinger. (jkb)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Margaret Liles Johnson. (jkb)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Benjamin Hugh Johnson. (jkb)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12895607) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Kahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Kahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Hugh Johnson
Represented By: Charles Samuel Conerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Liles Johnson
Represented By: Charles Samuel Conerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland T. Disinger
Represented By: Henry Milton Quillian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy K. Disinger
Represented By: Henry Milton Quillian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?