Springfield Construction, Inc. v. Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Springfield Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00185
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
County: Bartow
Presiding Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery-Interrogatory to Defendant by Springfield Construction, Inc..(Akin, William)
October 10, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery-Requests for Admission to Defendant by Springfield Construction, Inc..(Akin, William)
October 10, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery - Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Springfield Construction, Inc..(Akin, William)
October 10, 2018 Submission of #18 MOTION For Accounting by Defendant , to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (jta)
October 8, 2018 Filing 32 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #27 Counterclaim Verified Amended Counterclaim by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-New Construction Purchase & Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Cancellation of Affidavit)(Akin, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 28, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION For Accounting by Defendant filed by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Accounting)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE Of Filing by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Geiger Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for Geiger Law, LLC)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 26, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE Of Filing by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC of Proof of Service of Subpoena on David A. Geiger (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for David A. Geiger)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice Springfield's #11 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 9/26/18. (jta)
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 Amended COUNTERCLAIM Verified Amended Counterclaim against Springfield Construction, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC.(Heim, Magdalena) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Springfield Construction, Inc.'s #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 9/21/18. (jta)
September 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Jerry L. Springfield, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for Jerry L. Springfield, Sr.)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 21, 2018 Submission of #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (jta)
September 21, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re #23 Response in Support of Motion. Wrong event used. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections. (jta)
September 20, 2018 Filing 24 Initial Disclosures by Springfield Construction, Inc..(Akin, William)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Akin, William) Modified on 9/21/2018 to edit text to accurately reflect e-filed document (jta).
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE Of Filing by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Leslie Vaughan Simmons (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for Leslie Vaughan Simmons)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE Of Filing by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC of Proof of Service of Subpoena on Leslie Vaughan Simmons, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service for Leslie Vaughan Simmons, LLC)(Heim, Magdalena)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, Paragraph 77 and Exhibit 10 filed by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (Heim, Magdalena)
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (Heim, Magdalena)
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION For Accounting by Defendant with Brief In Support by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Accounting)(Akin, William) Modified on 9/18/2018 to remove double wording (jta).
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents Served on September 17, 2018 by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC.(Heim, Magdalena)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents Served on September 14, 2018 by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC.(Heim, Magdalena)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court places this case on a 6 month discovery track. Discovery ends on 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 9/10/2018. (dob)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Akin, William)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Harold L. Murphy. (jta)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Akin, William)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim, Paragraph 77 and Exhibit 10 with Brief In Support by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Paragraph 77 and Exhibit 10 of Counterclaim)(Akin, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 to remove double wording (jta).
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of Defendant's Counterclaim with Brief In Support by Springfield Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV, V of Defendant's Counterclaim)(Akin, William) Modified on 9/5/2018 to remove double wording(jta).
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #2 Counterclaim by Springfield Construction, Inc..(Akin, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (Heim, Magdalena)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Matthew Wilson on behalf of Springfield Construction, Inc. (Wilson, Walter)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Lester Tate, III on behalf of Springfield Construction, Inc. (Tate, Samuel)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Defendant's Proof of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC (Heim, Magdalena)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 8/16/18. (jta)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (jta)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER (filed in Bartow Co., Superior Court) to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Discovery ends on 1/14/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Springfield Construction, Inc. with Jury Demand by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC.(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2018: #1 Verification/Exhibits to Answer) (jta).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-8082911) (Attachments: #1 Superior Ct Summons; Complaint;Exhibits, #2 Superior Ct Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springfield Construction, Inc. v. Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springfield Construction, Inc.
Represented By: William Morgan Akin
Represented By: Samuel Lester Tate, III
Represented By: Walter Matthew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Choice Realty and Investments, LLC
Represented By: Edwin Jay Schklar
Represented By: Magdalena Maria Heim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?