Harvey v. Berry et al
Petitioner: Reginald C. Harvey
Respondent: Michael McCarthy, Walter Berry, Jennifer D. Baxter, Timothy C. Ward, Jim Wilbank, Brandon Cannon, Harold Cochran, Christopher Guay and Rhonda Arnett Harrod
Case Number: 4:2019cv00075
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Harold L Murphy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Reginald C. Harvey re #9 Order (jta)
June 5, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (jta)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: petitioner's Motion for Leave to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition Without Prejudice #8 is GRANTED. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(B). Petitioner's Motion for Service #6 and Motion to Hire Investigator #7 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/5/19. (jta)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition without prejudice #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Reginald C. Harvey. (jta)
May 6, 2019 Submission of #7 MOTION to Hire an Investigator to Aid in Preparation of Defense..., to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jta)
May 6, 2019 Submission of #6 MOTION for Service, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Hire an Investigator to Aid in Preparation of Defense... by Reginald C. Harvey. (jta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by USM by Reginald C. Harvey. (jta)
May 6, 2019 Clerk added street address re #5 Notice of Change of Pro Se Address (jta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address (Update) for Reginald C. Harvey (jta)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Reginald Harvey (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jta)
May 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Reginald C. Harvey re #3 Order and Forms Sent. (klb)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send petitioner a copy of this Courts form 2254 petition and form IFP affidavit for prisoners, with the case number for this action stamped on both of those forms. If petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, to complete and return the form 2254 petition and form IFP affidavit for prisoners, with all required information, signatures, certifications, and attachments. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon petitioners compliance with this Order or the expiration of the aforementioned thirty-day time period.(Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization; 28:2254 Forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/1/19. (klb)
April 18, 2019 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jta)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald C. Harvey. (jta)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Reginald C. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Summons, #4 Case Filing Information Form)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Berry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginald C. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer D. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Wilbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Guay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rhonda Arnett Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?