Cleary v. Relogio LLC
Plaintiff: Sherie Cleary
Defendant: Relogio LLC, Employment Alliances, LLC, Agora Notus, LLC and Employment Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00130
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sherie Cleary. (Conlon, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Relogio LLC, Agora Notus, LLC, Employment Innovations, Inc., Employment Alliances, LLCwith Jury Demand filed by Sherie Cleary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Check Number 54210, #2 Exhibit Form WH-58)(Conlon, Nicholas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Relogio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Brief, #5 Exhibit D to Brief, #6 Exhibit E to Brief, #7 Exhibit F to Brief, #8 Exhibit G to Brief)(Twyman, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing by Sherie Cleary Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Consent to Join)(Conlon, Nicholas)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jason Travis Brown. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/01/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
July 31, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Travis Brown Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.(Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8777347). Attorney Roger W. Orlando added appearing on behalf of Sherie Cleary (jkm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Travis Brown Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Sherie Cleary. (Orlando, Roger)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Sherie Cleary. Relogio LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Conlon, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas Raymond Conlon. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/12/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
July 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas Raymond Conlon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8777370). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Roger W. Orlando added appearing on behalf of Sherie Cleary (jkm)
July 12, 2019 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Travis Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8777347). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: incorrect pdf. (pmb)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/10/2019. (tmf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas Raymond Conlon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8777370). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Sherie Cleary. (Orlando, Roger)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Travis Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8777347). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Sherie Cleary. (Orlando, Roger)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Relogio LLC. (tmf)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sherie Cleary Relogio LLC c/o Shane Lovingood (Orlando, Roger)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing by Sherie Cleary Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join)(Orlando, Roger)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sherie Cleary. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8748550) (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleary v. Relogio LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherie Cleary
Represented By: Roger W. Orlando
Represented By: Jason T. Brown
Represented By: Nicholas R. Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relogio LLC
Represented By: Christopher Paul Twyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Alliances, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agora Notus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?