Bishop v. River City Bank
Appellant: Anthony Todd Bishop
Appellee: River City Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv00215
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Todd Bishop re #5 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (jed)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 11/21/2019. (jed)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gentry, Rhonda)
October 9, 2019 Submission of #2 Order,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Todd Bishop re #3 Order. (tmf)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/24/2019. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 298.00, receipt number 174188 (aar)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Todd Bishop re #2 Order,. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant Anthony Todd Bishop shall pay the required appeal filing fee of $298.00 or submit an application to proceed informa pauperis on or before October 7, 2019. If Appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal may be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 4i.3A(2) for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned on October 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/23/2019. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, for ifp determinaton, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (jta)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Todd Bishop. USBC Case#: 19-41804. Notice of Appeal filed 9/20/19 from Order entered 9/10/19 by Appellant Anthony Todd Bishop. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of appeal, #3 Order Appealed)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. River City Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anthony Todd Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: River City Bank
Represented By: Thomas Dow Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?