Vice v. Rimer et al
Plaintiff: Doris J. Vice
Defendant: John Doe, M.D., P.C. and Lloyd J. Rimer, M.D.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00011
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan form completed and filed by the parties, the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: 8-month discovery track. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/11/2020. (tmf)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Doris J. Vice. (Marigliano, Jonathan)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by Doris J. Vice.(Marigliano, Jonathan)
February 11, 2020 Clerks Notation re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lloyd J. Rimer, MD by Lloyd J. Rimer, MD.(Ammerman, Douglas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ammerman on behalf of Lloyd J. Rimer, MD (Ammerman, Douglas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Lloyd J. Rimer, MD. Discovery ends on 7/10/2020.(Hall, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Doris J. Vice. Lloyd J. Rimer, MD served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Blevins, David)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/17/2020. (rjs)
January 17, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Doris J. Vice. (dob)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lloyd J. Rimer, MD. (dob)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Doris J. Vice. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC9269506) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vice v. Rimer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, M.D., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Rimer, M.D.
Represented By: Douglas Ammerman
Represented By: John E. Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris J. Vice
Represented By: Michael Alexander Prieto
Represented By: Jonathan Marigliano
Represented By: David J. Blevins
Represented By: William F. Holbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?