Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. v. Gifaldi
Plaintiff: Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc.
Defendant: Courtney Gifaldi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00049
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc.. (Rooks, William)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (kt)
April 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (kt)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING the case. The parties shall execute the settlement documents and file the dismissals consistent with their Notice of Settlement [Doc. 10]. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (kt)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. (contained in #10 Notice of filing). (kt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. (Rooks, William)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (kt)
March 12, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 3/12/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. Courtney Gifaldi served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Rooks, William) Modified on 3/11/2020 to correct docket text. (kt).
March 5, 2020 Clerks Approval re #7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9418834. (Rooks, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Courtney Gifaldi. (ah)
February 28, 2020 Clerk's Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Rooks, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. (Rooks, William) Modified to add text on 2/28/2020 (ah).
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. (Rooks, William)
February 27, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (bjh)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9418834) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh A, #3 Exh B)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc. v. Gifaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vantel International/Pearls In The Oyster Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Willis
Represented By: William Rooks
Represented By: Chittam Udayan Thakore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Gifaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?