Busby et al v. Gatti et al
Plaintiff: E-Tax, Inc., Mark Busby and eBuzz Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Jeffrey Jacobson, Jordan Jacobson, Peter Gatti, Christopher Gatti and Justin Jacobson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00059
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Submission of #14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bjh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Compel Arbitration with Brief In Support by Christopher Gatti, Peter Gatti, Jeffrey Jacobson, Jordan Jacobson, Justin Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Ficken, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (bjh)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service , as to Peter Gatti. (Godwin, Jason)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Amended Complaint and Summons , as to Jeffrey Jacoson. (Godwin, Jason)
March 8, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Mark Busby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Godwin, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/6/20. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/6/20. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jordan Jacobson. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Justin Jacobson. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Christopher Gatti. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Jacobson. (bjh)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter Gatti. (bjh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by eBuzz Technologies, Inc., Mark Busby, E-Tax, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9450126) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busby et al v. Gatti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jacobson
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Jacobson
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Gatti
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gatti
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Jacobson
Represented By: Allison S. H. Ficken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Tax, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Busby
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eBuzz Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?