Engineered Floors, LLC v. Lakeshore Equipment Company
Plaintiff: Engineered Floors, LLC
Defendant: Lakeshore Equipment Company doing business as Lakeshore Learning Materials
Counter Claimant: Lakeshore Equipment Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00169
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 26 Supplement to #15 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Memorandum Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss filed by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura) Modified on 9/11/2020 to edit docket entry (ddm).
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery) by Engineered Floors, LLC.(DiBiase, Laura)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lakeshore Equipment Company of Initial Disclosures (Deshmukh, Viraj)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative DismissMOTION to Dismiss filed by Lakeshore Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Dec Dale Davis Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Dec Brian Owens Motion to Dismiss)(Deshmukh, Viraj)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Stay Stay Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC in Response to Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Stay Discovery) filed by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan [Doc. #13 ], the Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified. 1. Initial disclosures shall be served no later than September 2, 2020; 2. This case is assigned a six-month discovery period. Discovery is open and shall close on February 24, 2021. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/25/2020. (tcc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Affidavit,, (Supplemental Declaration of Dale Davis) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Brian Owens in Support of Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Dale Davis in Support of Declaration of Laura K. DiBiase in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(DiBiase, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of Laura K. DiBiase in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R)(DiBiase, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative DismissMOTION to Dismiss (Memorandum of Engineered Floors, LLC Opposing Motion of Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company to Transfer Venue or Dismiss) filed by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DiBiase, Laura)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Stay Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines with Brief In Support by Lakeshore Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay, #2 Brief Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Stay)(Deshmukh, Viraj)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim (Plaintiff Engineered Floors, LLC's Defenses and Answer to Counterclaims by Defendant Lakeshore Equipment Company d/b/a Lakeshore Learning Materials) by Engineered Floors, LLC.(DiBiase, Laura) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER : For good cause shown, the #9 Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Order is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer no later than August 21, 2020, and Defendant's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/7/20. (bnw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Engineered Floors, LLC. (DuPre, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Transfer or Dismiss re: #5 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative DismissMOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Order Extending Time for Plaintiff Engineered Floors, LLC to File Response to Lakeshore Equipment Company's Motion to Transfer or Dismiss) by Engineered Floors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(DuPre, William)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Response and Objections to Plaintiff's RFAs by Lakeshore Equipment Company.(Deshmukh, Viraj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 12/21/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Engineered Floors, LLC with Jury Demand by Lakeshore Equipment Company.(Deshmukh, Viraj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue or in the Alternative Dismiss with Brief In Support by Lakeshore Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exh. 1-5)(Deshmukh, Viraj) . Added MOTION to Dismiss on 7/27/2020 (ddm).
July 21, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/21/20. (bnw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lakeshore Equipment Company. (Diehl, William)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (bjh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT from State Court filed by Lakeshore Equipment Company. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9926847) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exh State Pleadings)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engineered Floors, LLC v. Lakeshore Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engineered Floors, LLC
Represented By: Michael Paul Kohler
Represented By: Laura K. DiBiase
Represented By: William Anderson DuPre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Equipment Company doing business as Lakeshore Learning Materials
Represented By: William Diehl
Represented By: Viraj Prashant Deshmukh
Represented By: Albert Fred Nasuti
Represented By: Michael Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lakeshore Equipment Company
Represented By: William Diehl
Represented By: Viraj Prashant Deshmukh
Represented By: Albert Fred Nasuti
Represented By: Michael Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?