Nelson v. PJ Cheese, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allyn Todd Nelson
Defendant: PJ Cheese, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00242
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of William K Hancock Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney William K. Hancock added appearing on behalf of PJ Cheese, Inc. (nmb)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/10/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of William K Hancock Pro Hac Vice.by PJ Cheese, Inc.. (Campbell, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 4, 2020 RETURN of #10 APPLICATION for Admission of William K. Hancock Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: appearing on behalf of. (cdg)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of William K. Hancock Pro Hac Vice.by PJ Cheese, Inc.. (Campbell, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 2, 2020 RETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of William K Hancock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10411632). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel address. (nmb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Confirmation of Arbitration Award Plus Award of Fees and Costs with Brief In Support by Allyn Todd Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Final Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Dispute Resolution Program, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Corporate Structure, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Potashnick Declaration & Time Records, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Karsh Declaration & Time Records, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Weiner Declaration & Time Records)(Potashnick, Mark)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #4 Petition for Arbitration, filed by PJ Cheese, Inc.. (Campbell, John)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of William K Hancock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10411632).by PJ Cheese, Inc.. (Campbell, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 #6 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/6/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
November 5, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Eli Karsh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10328372).. Attorney Eli Karsh added appearing on behalf of Allyn Todd Nelson (nmb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Eli Karsh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10328372).by Allyn Todd Nelson. (Weiner, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 26, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Alan Potashnick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10297242). Attorney Mark Alan Potashnick added appearing on behalf of Allyn Todd Nelson (cdg)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Alan Potashnick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10297242).by Allyn Todd Nelson. (Weiner, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Allyn Todd Nelson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC10292832) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 2001 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENTCIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dob)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PJ Cheese, Inc.. (dob)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILING ERROR COMPLAINT filed by Allyn Todd Nelson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC10292832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/22/2020 (dob).
October 22, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #1 Complaint. Incorrect event selected. Clerk made necessary changes and re-docketed at #4 Petition to Confirm Arbitration. (dob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. PJ Cheese, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Cheese, Inc.
Represented By: John Wallace Campbell
Represented By: William K. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyn Todd Nelson
Represented By: Andrew Weiner
Represented By: Eli Karsh
Represented By: Mark Alan Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?