Parris v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Earl Parris, Jr.
Defendant: Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Huntsman International, LLC, Town of Trion, Georgia, 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company and The Chemours Company
Intervenor Plaintiff: City of Summerville, Georgia
Case Number: 4:2021cv00040
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 405 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company.(annJohnson, John)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #401 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Quentin F Urquhart, Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/28/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Quentin F Urquhart, Jr re #403 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #398 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Sinnott. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/27/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #401 APPLICATION for Admission of Quentin F Urquhart, Jr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12768944). Attorney Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr. added appearing on behalf of 3M Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to John Sinnott re #402 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 401 APPLICATION for Admission of Quentin F Urquhart, Jr Pro Hac Vice.by 3M Company. (Witte, Monica) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #398 APPLICATION for Admission of John Sinnott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12768061). Attorney John Sinnott added appearing on behalf of 3M Company. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (smj)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN of #400 APPLICATION for Admission of Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12768944) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: The application does not comply with the Local Rules of this Court regarding the formatting of pleadings. (smj)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 400 APPLICATION for Admission of Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12768944).by 3M Company. (Witte, Monica) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 399 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories and Second Request for Production of Documents by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 398 APPLICATION for Admission of John Sinnott Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12768061).by 3M Company. (Witte, Monica) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Beegle in his individual capacity filed by Daikin America, Inc. (Dyal, Jonathan)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Cross NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. and Ron Beegle filed by City of Summerville, Georgia (Davis, Jesse)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 395 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr of Revised Deposition Notice to Defendant Mount Vernon Mills (Davis, Gary)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Cross NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. and Ron Beegle filed by City of Summerville, Georgia (Davis, Jesse)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 393 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr of Notice of Deposition to Defendant Mount Vernon Mills Inc. (Davis, Gary)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 392 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr of Second Discovery Requests to Defendant Huntsman International LLC (Davis, Gary)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Discovery Requests to Defendants DuPont and Chemours (Davis, Gary)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 COS Discovery - Summerville Responses to DuPont and Chemours Discovery by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 389 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earl Parris, Jr.(Johnston, Keith)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Kali Eason on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (Eason, Leslie)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laurie Ann Taylor terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/09/223. (jkb)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MOTION to Withdraw Laurie Ann Taylor as Attorneyby Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Taylor, Laurie)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company.(Cash, Blair)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry) granting #384 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Decker terminated. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/21/2023. (jeh)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION to Withdraw Katherine Decker as Attorneyby Town of Trion, Georgia. (Decker, Katherine)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #382 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wesley B. Gilchrist. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/14/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Wesley B. Gilchrist re #383 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jkb)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [382} APPLICATION for Admission of Wesley B. Gilchrist Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12514784). Attorney Wesley B. Gilchrist added appearing on behalf of 3M Company (cdg)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 382 APPLICATION for Admission of Wesley B. Gilchrist Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12514784).by 3M Company. (Witte, Monica) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE by Town of Trion, Georgia of the Withdrawal of Kimberly C. Sheridan (Sheridan, Kimberly)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting #312 Motion for In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/17/2023. (dmb)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER denying #328 Motion to Compel without prejudice filed by Earl Parris, Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/17/2023. (dmb)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 378 PROPOSED ORDER on Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel re: #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses . (Droze, William)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 377 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff and Intervenor Plaintiff's Objection to Assertion of Privilege and Motion for In Camera Review. (Johnston, Keith)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Decker on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (Decker, Katherine)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ANSWER to #351 Amended Complaint of Intervenor-Plaintiff by The Chemours Company.(Eason, Donavan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ANSWER to #351 Amended Complaint of Intervenor-Plaintiff by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company.(Eason, Donavan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2023 re #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Earl Parris, Jr., #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege filed by Earl Parris, Jr. the Court GRANTED the #312 Motion for In Camera Review and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE the #328 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses for failure to comply with LR 37.1. The Court encouraged the parties to confer and attempt to resolve any pending discovery disputes. Written orders will follow. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(jkb)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #369 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Solace Kirkland Southwick terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/10/2023. (jkb)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY to Response to Motion re #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Davis, Gary)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting #366 Application for Nathan M. Smith Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/08/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MOTION to Withdraw Solace K. Southwick as Attorney by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal as Counsel)(Fox, Benjamin) Modified to correct withdrawing attorney's name on 3/8/2023 (ceo).
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Nathan M. Smith re #370 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jkb)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses . Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2023 at 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1600961562 Meeting ID: 160 096 1562 Passcode: 760063 or dial 669 254 5252. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jeh) Modified on 3/7/2023 to edit hearing time (jeh). Modified on 3/8/2023 (jeh).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #366 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12428169).. Attorney Nathan M. Smith added appearing on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (kkh)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding. Correct hearing date added. (jeh)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 368 NOTICE by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. re #356 Reply to Response to Motion of Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.'s Objection to Plaintiffs' Reply Exhibits (Droze, William)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ANSWER to #351 Amended Complaint in Intervention by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 366 APPLICATION for Admission of Nathan M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12428169).by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Nathan M. Smith)(Fox, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ANSWER to #351 Amended Complaint by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #364 Leave of Absence by William Droze. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by William Droze on these dates. (jeh)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 05/18-19/2023, 05/22-26/2023, 05/29-31/2023, 06/01-02/2023, by William Middleton Droze. (Droze, William)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Revised Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Town of Trion by Daikin America, Inc..(Dyal, Jonathan)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Revised Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Town of Trion (Davis, Gary)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 361 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE City of Summerville's Responses to Daikin America, Inc's First Discovery Requests by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 360 RESPONSE in Opposition re #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Droze, William)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Return of Service Executed by City of Summerville, Georgia. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company served on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. (Davis, Jesse)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Return of Service Executed by City of Summerville, Georgia. The Chemours Company served on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. (Davis, Jesse)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Discovery Responses to Defendant Daikin America Inc. (Davis, Gary)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege filed by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Jesse)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Electronic Summons Issued as to E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (dmb)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Electronic Summons Issued as to The Chemours Company. (dmb)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 353 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by City of Summerville, Georgia to E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Davis, Jesse)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 352 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by City of Summerville, Georgia to The Chemours Company (Davis, Jesse)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 351 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Intervention against 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Huntsman International, LLC, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, The Chemours Company, Town of Trion, Georgiawith Jury Demand filed by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #340 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Dyal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/16/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dmb)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #344 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File its Amended Complaint in Intervention with Brief In Support by City of Summerville, Georgia. Discovery ends on 11/23/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/16/2023. (dmb) Modified on 2/16/2023 (dmb).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #346 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff Earl Parris Jr. and Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville's #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. The time for Mount Vernon to respond to Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Compel is extended up to and including February 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/16/2023. (jeh)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 347 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Daikin America, Inc.'s Cross-Notice of Videotaped 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant, Town of Trion, Georgia by Daikin America, Inc..(Yeilding, Christopher)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #340 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Dyal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12374078). Attorney Jonathan Dyal added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (cdg)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff Earl Parris Jr. and Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville's Joint Motion to Compel re: #328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Droze, William)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 345 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER City of Summerville, DuPont, and Chemours' Consent for City of Summerville to Refile its Amended Complaint and Withdrawal of Motion to Strike and Extension to Complete Discovery re: #339 MOTION to Strike #301 Response to Motion . (Davis, Jesse)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File its Amended Complaint in Intervention with Brief In Support by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Davis, Jesse)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RESPONSE re #339 MOTION to Strike #301 Response to Motion to Strike filed by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #335 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/15/2023. (dmb)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: Status Conference held on 2/8/2023. The Court directed the partiesto file any objections by 12:00 PM on 02/15/2023. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(jkb)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 340 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Dyal Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12374078).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Hollis, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MOTION to Strike #301 Response to Motion by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Cash, Blair)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #331 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel H Weigel terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/6/2023. (jeh)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE re #333 Response in Opposition to Motion, Town of Trion, Georgia's Joinder in Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Assertion of Privilege and Motion for In Camera Review filed by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting #330 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 02/03/2023. (jkb)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #334 Notice of Filing, by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Droze, William)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 334 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Documents in Support of Mount Vernon's Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Assertion of Privilege by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. re #333 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 2, 2020 Emails, #2 Exhibit B - December 1, 2020 Email)(Droze, William) Modified docket text on 2/15/2023 (dmb).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 RESPONSE in Opposition re #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 2, 2020 Emails, #2 Exhibit B - December 1, 2020 Email, #3 Exhibit C - January 11, 2023 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - August 9, 2022 Email)(Droze, William)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Jerome Dean terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/3/2023. (jeh)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION to Withdraw Daniel H Weigel as Attorneyby Ryan Dejuan Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weigel, Daniel)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #329 Notice of Filing by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Gary)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 329 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Earl Parris, Jr Unredacted Motion to Compel and Sealed Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 2007 Letters, #2 Exhibit 16 MVM Retention Policy)(Davis, Gary) Modified on 2/3/2023 (jkb).
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. December 5 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2. MVM RInterrogatory Responses, #3 Exhibit 3. 10/25 Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4.10/26 Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5. 10/31 Email Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6. 11/3 Email Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7. 11/7 Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8. 11/7 Email Correspondence (response), #9 Exhibit 9. 11/9 Email Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 10. 11/9 Email Correspondence (response), #11 Exhibit 11. 11/10 Email Correspondence, #12 Exhibit 12. December 15 Letter, #13 Exhibit 13. 1999 Letter, #14 Exhibit 14. Slipsheet, #15 Exhibit 15. Deposition Excerpt, #16 Exhibit 16. Slipsheet, #17 Exhibit 17. Deposition Excerpt, #18 Exhibits Index)(Davis, Gary)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Status Conference set for 2/8/2023 at 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617126079 Meeting ID: 161 712 6079 Passcode: 923954 or dial 669 254 5252. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jeh)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Causby on behalf of Earl Parris, Jr (Causby, Thomas)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MOTION to Withdraw Jeffrey J. Dean as Attorney by Earl Parris, Jr, Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Causby, Thomas) Modified on 2/3/2023 to edit text (jeh).
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ANSWER to COMPLAINT (City of Summerville, Georgia's Amended Complaint in Intervention) by Daikin America, Inc..(Yeilding, Christopher) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Chemours Company. (Cole, Meghan)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Certificate of Interested Persons by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (Cole, Meghan)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Withdrawal of Motion #294 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by 3M Company filed by 3M Company, City of Summerville, Georgia. (Remar, Robert)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Submission of #294 MOTION for More Definite Statement , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 321 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Daikin America, Inc..(Yeilding, Christopher)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #314 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/24/2023. (dmb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #308 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Ashby Pate. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/24/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #305 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Lana A. Olson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/24/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #306 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mary P. McCracken. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/24/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #304 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John M Johnson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/24/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting #307 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Megan S. Cole. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/24/2023. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re: #304 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Johnson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323481).. Attorney John Mann Johnson added appearing on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rvb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re: #306 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary Parrish McCracken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323519). Attorney Mary Parrish McCracken added appearing on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rvb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re: #305 APPLICATION for Admission of Lana A. Olson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323503). Attorney Lana A. Olson added appearing on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rvb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerk's Office re: #307 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan S. Cole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323534). Attorney Meghan Salvati Cole added appearing on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rvb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #308 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ashby Pate Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323547). Attorney Robert Ashby Pate added appearing on behalf of E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (rvb)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #313 Notice of Filing, Exhibits to Motion for In Camera Review by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Gary)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing by Earl Parris, Jr re #312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Letter to William Droze)(Davis, Gary) Modified on 1/25/2023 (dmb).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION for In Camera Review and Objection to Assertion of Privilege by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Slipsheet, #2 Exhibit B Slipsheet)(Davis, Gary)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE Of Filing Answer to City of Summerville, Georgia Complaint in Intervention by 3M Company re #301 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 3M's Answer to City of Summerville, Georgia's Amended Complaint in Intervention)(Radney, W.)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE by City of Summerville, Georgia re #309 Certificate of Service City of Summerville, Georgia's Cross-Notice of Taking 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Town of Trion, Georgia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request to Produce)(Davis, Jesse)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Town of Trion (Davis, Gary)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Ashby Pate Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323547).by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cash, Blair) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 APPLICATION for Admission of Meghan S. Cole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323534).by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cash, Blair) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 306 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary Parrish McCracken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323519).by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cash, Blair) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 305 APPLICATION for Admission of Lana A. Olson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323503).by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cash, Blair) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Johnson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12323481).by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. (Cash, Blair) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by The Chemours Company.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 RESPONSE re #294 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint in Invervention)(Davis, Jesse)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #299 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant 3M's #294 Motion for More Definite Statement. Summerville shall have through and including, Friday, January 6, 2022, in which to respond. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/27/2022. (jeh)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to D 3M's Motion for More Definite Statement re: #294 MOTION for More Definite Statement by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Jesse)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Harriett Cramer on behalf of 3M Company (Cramer, Emma)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by William Coleman McFerren on behalf of 3M Company (McFerren, William)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 3M Company's ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by 3M Company.(Radney, W.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for a More Definite Statement)(Remar, Robert)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 RESPONSE re Notification of Docket Correction, of Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. to Intervenor Plaintiff City of Summerville, Georgia's Joinder in Plaintiff's Second Amended Individual and Class Action Complaint filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Droze, William)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint and Joinder by Daikin America, Inc..(Hollis, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Pulcra Chemicals, LLC's Defenses and ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint (Second) by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #280 Amended Complaint by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #279 Application for Admission of Tatum Jackson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/28/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rsg)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #278 Application for Admission of Keith A. Johnston Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/28/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rsg)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Davis, Gary)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. The Chemours Company served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Davis, Gary)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tatum Jackson re #288 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rsg)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Keith A. Johnston re #287 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rsg)
November 25, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #279 APPLICATION for Admission of Tatum Jackson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12211746).. Attorney Tatum Jackson added appearing on behalf of 3M Company (kkh)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #283 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Leigh D'Ambrosio terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/23/2022. (jeh)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #278 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A Johnston Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Keith A. Johnston added appearing on behalf of Earl Parris, Jr., Earl Parris, Jr. (pdt)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Withdraw Katherine Leigh D'Ambrosio as Attorneyby 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - [Proposed] Order Granting Withdrawal as Counsel)(D'Ambrosio, Katherine)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Insiya F. Aziz #276 . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/22/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(gas)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #281 NOTICE Intervenor Plaintiff City of Summerville, Georgia's Joinder in Plaintiff's #280 Second Amended Individual and Class Action Complaint by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse) Modified on 11/22/2022 to terminate motion and edit event and document links (per phone call from attorney's office)(tmf).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE Intervenor Plaintiff City of Summerville, Georgia's Joinder in Plaintiff's #280 Second Amended Individual and Class Action Complaint by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse) Modified on 11/22/2022 to terminate motion and edit event and document links (per phone call from attorney's office)(tmf).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Huntsman International, LLC, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Town of Trion, Georgia, E.I DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Companywith Jury Demand filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons to The Chemours Company, #2 Summons to Du Pont de Nemours and Company)(Davis, Gary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 APPLICATION for Admission of Tatum Jackson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12211746).by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #276 APPLICATION for Admission of Insiya F. Aziz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12197543). Attorney Insiya F. Aziz added appearing on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (pdt)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A Johnston Pro Hac Vice.by Earl Parris, Jr. (Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Supplemental Response to PL First Set of Interrogatories by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN of #274 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A Johnston Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Payment of fees. (cdg)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 APPLICATION for Admission of Insiya F. Aziz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12197543).by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Fox, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Responses to City of Summerville's 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition and 30(b)(2) Document Requests and Responses to PL's Cross-Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 APPLICATION for Admission of Keith A Johnston Pro Hac Vice.by Earl Parris, Jr, Earl Parris, Jr. (Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #269 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Larkin Radney, IV. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/9/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bgt)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #268 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harlan I. Prater, IV. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/9/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bgt)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #267 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark Christian King. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/9/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bgt)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #268 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I. Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172670). Attorney Harlan Irby Prater, IV added appearing on behalf of 3M Company (cdg)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #269 APPLICATION for Admission of William Larkin Radney, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172686). Attorney W. Larkin Radney, IV added appearing on behalf of 3M Company (cdg)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN of #270 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Causby Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12175630) to attorney for correction. Re: PDF attached for wrong attorney. (pdt)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #267 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Christian King Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172638). Attorney Mark Christian King added appearing on behalf of 3M Company (cdg)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Causby Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12175630).by Earl Parris, Jr. (Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 APPLICATION for Admission of William Larkin Radney, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172686).by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I. Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172670).by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Christian King Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12172638).by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE City of Summerville's Rule 5.4 COS Supplemental Response 3M's 1st Interrogatories by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Intervenor Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 COS Responses to D 3M's 1st Interrogatories by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Cross-Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition on Mount Vernon Mills (Davis, Gary)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Mount Vernon Mills filed by City of Summerville, Georgia (Davis, Jesse)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Plaintiff's Discovery Responses to Defendant 3M (Davis, Gary)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER: The Court orders that the number and page limitations for briefs regarding Class Certification are as follows: Plaintiff will be permitted to file a Class Certification opening brief and a reply brief, totaling no more than 65 pages combined. Plaintiff may allocate those 65 pages among his opening brief and reply brief however he so chooses. In addition, Plaintiff will be permitted to file a reply brief of no more than 7 pages to any individual Defendants supplemental brief regarding class certification. Defendants in this matter will be permitted to jointly file asingle, consolidated opposition response brief regarding class certification totaling no more than 65 pages. In addition, each Defendant will be permitted to file a supplemental brief of no more than 7 pages. The Parties will meet and confer and submit a Proposed Order (orcompeting proposals) addressing summary judgment and Daubert briefing twenty-one (21) days after Defendants disclose merits experts pursuant to Paragraph 9 of the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 187). In the event the Parties cannot reach agreement they will submit competing proposals for resolution by the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/6/2022. (jra)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Kaplan, Jr on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Kaplan, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Joint Notice Of Filing a Proposed Briefing Order by 3M Company, Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Town of Trion, Georgia, Huntsman International LLC, Daikin America, Inc., City of Summerville, Georgia, and Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Briefing Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing)(Remar, Robert) Modified on 10/11/2022 (jra).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 10/11/2022 (jra).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Davis, Gary) Modified on 10/4/2022 (jra).
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James S. Whitlock terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/29/2022. (jeh)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION to Withdraw James S. Whitlock as Attorney by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 9/29/2022 (jra).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by 3M Company.(Harmon, Benjamin) Modified on 9/28/2022 to edit text (jra).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Hollis on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Hollis, James)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Rule 5.4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by 3M Company.(Remar, Robert) Modified on 9/23/2022 to edit text(jra).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 9/23/2022 to edit text(jra).
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #246 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time FOR INTERVENOR PLAINTIFF CITY OF SUMMERVILLE, GEORGIA TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S DISCOVERY. Summerville shall have through and including, Friday, September 23, 2022, in which to respond to 3M Company's First Request for Production of Documents to Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/20/2022. (jeh)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the #245 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Order, and extends the deadline for the parties to submit a Proposed Briefing Order regarding class certification, summary judgment, and Daubert motions through and including October 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/20/2022. (jra)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time FOR INTERVENOR PLAINTIFF CITY OF SUMMERVILLE, GEORGIA TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S DISCOVERY by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Jesse)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Order by 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Town of Trion, Georgia , Huntsman International LLC, Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, City of Summerville, Georgia, and Earl Parris, Jr.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Remar, Robert) Modified on 9/19/2022 to edit text (jra).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to City of Summerville's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #242 Joint Motion For Entry of Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/7/2022. (jra)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint Motion For Entry of Consent Decree by Earl Parris, Jr, City of Summerville, and Ryan Dejuan Jarrett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DOJ Correspondence, #2 Consent Decree)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 9/7/2022 to edit text(jra).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery by 3M Company.(Remar, Robert) Modified on 9/6/2022 to edit text (jra).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #237 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erich P Nathe. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #238 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2022. (jra)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #240 Order on Application for Admission PHV, Erich P Nathe. (jra)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #237 APPLICATION for Admission of Erich P. Nathe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12017735). Attorney Erich P. Nathe added appearing on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (cdg)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Joint Motion for Entry of A Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement And Protective Order by Earl Parris, Jr., 3M Company, Huntsman International, LLC, Daikan America, Inc., Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Town of Trion, Georgia, Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, and City of Sumerville, Georgia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 8/31/2022 to edit text (jra).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 APPLICATION for Admission of Erich P. Nathe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12017735).by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Kimberly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Rule 5.4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Modified on 8/25/2022 to edit text (jra).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Huntsman International LLCs Responses to Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories; and 2.Defendant Huntsman International LLCs Responses to Intervenor Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery Summerville's Resps to D Mt Vernon Mills 1st Request Admissions, 1st Interrogatories, 1st Request for Production by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.'s Discovery Requests (Whitlock, James)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Plaintiff Earl Parris, Jr. by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Kadeisha West on behalf of Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. (West, Kadeisha)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Rule 5.4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by 3M Company.(Harmon, Benjamin) Modified on 8/9/2022 to edit text(jra).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Rule 5.4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Defendant Huntsman International LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Modified on 8/8/2022 to edit text(jra).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Rule 5.4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Defendant Town of Trion, Georgia's Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Modified on 8/8/2022 to edit text(jra).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Modified on 8/8/2022 to edit text(jra).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Certificate of Consent by Huntsman International, LLC. Juliana Mesa withdrawing as counsel. (Mesa, Juliana) Modified on 8/8/2022 to edit text(jra).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #220 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Robert Saywell. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Robert Saywell re #225 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #220 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Saywell Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James Robert Saywell added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (cdg)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Notice Of Service of Proposed Consent Decree filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DOJ Receipt, #2 Exhibit B Certified Mail)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 8/2/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Saywell Pro Hac Vice.by Daikin America, Inc.. (Deane, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #219 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Emery Underwood terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/22/2022. (jeh)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kary Bryant Wolfe terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/22/2022. (jeh)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #217 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven F. Casey terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/22/2022. (jeh)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION to Withdraw William Emery Underwood as Attorney by Daikin America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order William E. Underwood Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (DAI-Parris))(Underwood, William) Modified on 7/22/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Withdraw Kary Bryant Wolfe as Attorney by Daikin America, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Kary B. Wolfe Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (DAI-Parris))(Wolfe, Kary) Modified on 7/22/2022 to edit text (jra).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Withdraw Steven F. Casey as Attorney by Daikin America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Steven F. Casey Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (DAI-Parris))(Casey, Steven) Modified on 7/22/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Joint Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by Earl Parris, Jr, City of Summerville, & Ryan Dejuan Jarrett (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 7/21/2022 to edit text (jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text (jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery Summerville's re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Huntsman International, LLC by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Huntsman International, LLC. by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text (jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Daikin America, Inc. by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Daikin America, Inc. by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text (jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discover re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant 3M Company by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Rule 5.4 Certificate of Serving Discovery re: Intervenor Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M Company by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the #206 Consent MOTION To Extend Date for Discovery Responses and ORDERS that Summerville shall respond to Mount Vernon's Interrogatories, Documents Requests, and Admissions by August 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/18/22. (jra)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Consent MOTION To Extend Date for Discovery Responses by City of Summerville, Georgia and Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 7/18/2022 to edit text(jra).
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie Ann Taylor on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (Taylor, Laurie)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the #203 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and ORDERS that: Huntsman International LLC shall respond to Plaintiff Earl Parris, Jr.'s First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by August 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/7/2022. (jra)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Consent Motion To Extend Date For Discovery Responses and ORDERS that Mount Vernon shall respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Document Requests by August 10, 2022; and Plaintiff shall respond to Mount Vernon's Interrogatories, Document Requests, and Admissions by August 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/29/2022. (jra)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Opinion and Order denying #157 Defendant Daikin America, Inc.'s Motion to Certify Questions to the Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/27/22.
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Consent Motion To Extend Date For Discovery Responses by Earl Parris, Jr. and Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Droze, William) Modified on 6/27/2022 to edit text (jra).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN of #198 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Saywell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11871539). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Allen, John)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Saywell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11871539).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Deane, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Intervenor City of Summerville, Georgia by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Plaintiff Earl Parris, Jr. by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Stipulated Joint Protocol Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/14/2022. (jra)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Stipulated Joint Protocol Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by 3M Company, Earl Parris, Jr., City of Summerville, Georgia, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Town of Trion, Georgia, Huntsman International LLC, and Daikin America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulated Joint Protocol Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information))(Harmon, Benjamin) Modified on 6/14/2022 to edit text (jra).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request For Production of Documents to Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 6/9/2022 to edit text (jra).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry) granting #192 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Submit Consent Order re Electronic Discovery Issues . The parties shall have until June 13, 2022 to submit an agreed ESI Order in compliance with the Court's Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/8/2022. (jeh) Modified on 6/8/2022 to edit text (jeh).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Submit Consent Order Regarding Electronic Discovery Issues by 3M Company, Huntsman International, LLC., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Town of Trion, Georgia, Earl Parris, Jr., and City of Summerville, Georgia (Harmon, Benjamin) Modified on 6/8/2022 to edit text(jra).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 6/7/2022 to edit text(jra).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 6/7/2022 to edit text (jra).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 6/7/2022 to edit text(jra).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Deane, Richard)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #180 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2022. Discovery ends on 5/18/2023. Motions due by 6/11/2024. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/24/2022. (jra)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #174 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Katie Suzanne Lonze. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/24/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by 3M Company.(Remar, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Katie Suzanne Lonze re #186 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Initial Disclosures by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett.(Pendergrast, Craig)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Initial Disclosures by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Whitlock, James) Modified on 5/24/2022 to edit text (jra).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by City of Summerville, Georgia, Earl Parris, Jr., 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Huntsman International, LLC, Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Town of Trion, Georgia, and Ryan Dejuan Jarrett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Scheduling Order)(Whitlock, James) Modified on 5/24/2022 to edit text(jra).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Initial Disclosures by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.(Droze, William)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by City of Summerville, Georgia.(Davis, Jesse) Modified on 5/24/2022 to edit text(jra).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Modified on 5/24/2022 to edit text (jra).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Initial Disclosures by Daikin America, Inc.(Underwood, William)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #174 APPLICATION for Admission of Katie Suzanne Lonze Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11812958). Attorney Katie Suzanne Lonze added appearing on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (cdg)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #175 Leave of Absence by Craig K. Pendergrast. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Craig K. Pendergrast on these dates. (jeh)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 14 through June 17, 2022, June 23 through June 28, 2022, August 25 through August 29, 2022, September 12, 2022, by Craig K. Pendergrast. (Pendergrast, Craig)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 APPLICATION for Admission of Katie Suzanne Lonze Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11812958).by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Kimberly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal filed by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B)(Davis, Jesse)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ANSWER to #153 Crossclaim by Defendant Jarrett in Response to City of Summerville's Complaint in Intervention by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ANSWER to #152 Crossclaim of Defendant Jarrett Filed in Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ANSWER to #153 Crossclaim by 3M Company.(Harmon, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ANSWER to #152 Crossclaim by 3M Company.(Harmon, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ANSWER to #153 Crossclaim AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF THE TOWN OF TRION TO CROSSCLAIM OF DEFENDANT RYAN DEJUAN JARRETT FILED IN RESPONSE TO CITY OF SUMMERVILLE'S COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ANSWER to #152 Crossclaim AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF THE TOWN OF TRION TO CROSSCLAIM OF DEFENDANT RYAN DEJUAN JARRETT FILED IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ANSWER to #153 Crossclaim by Daikin America, Inc..(Underwood, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ANSWER to #152 Crossclaim by Daikin America, Inc..(Underwood, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ANSWER to #152 and #153 Crossclaim by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett in Answer to Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville's Complaint in Intervention by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/17/2022 to edit text(jra).
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ANSWER to #153 Crossclaim Filed in Response to the Intervenor Complaint of the City of Summerville by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ANSWER to #152 Crossclaim Filed in Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Daikin America, Inc.'s Motion to Certify Questions to the Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal #158 is GRANTED. The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Daikin America, Inc.s Motionto Certify Questions to the Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal is extended up to and including May 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/6/2022. (jra)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H. Deane, Jr on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (Deane, Richard)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File A Response re: #157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Whitlock, James)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal with Brief In Support by Daikin America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Certify)(Grossman, Theodore) Modified on 4/28/2022 to edit text(jra).
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Amended Motion To Certify Questions To The Georgia Supreme Court or for Interlocutory Appeal with Brief In Support by Daikin America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Certify)(Grossman, Theodore) Modified on 4/28/2022 to edit text(jra).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #154 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Patterson on behalf of City of Summerville, Georgia (Patterson, Lee)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Certificate of Interested Persons by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against City of Summerville, Georgia with Jury Demand by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett.(Weigel, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/26/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ANSWER to #73 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and CROSSCLAIM against Earl Parris, Jr with Jury Demand by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett.(Weigel, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text(jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint by 3M Company.(Remar, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWER to #73 (First Amended) COMPLAINT by 3M Company.(Remar, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWER to #73 First Amended COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Huntsman International, LLC.(Fox, Benjamin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWER to #73 (First Amended) COMPLAINT by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC.(Nunez, E.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #137 Intervenor Complaint by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/26/2022 to edit text(jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ANSWER to #73 First Amended COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Town of Trion, Georgia.(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/26/2022 to edit text(jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc..(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ANSWER to #73 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.(Droze, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/26/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to #137 Intervenor Complaint by Daikin America, Inc..(Underwood, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ANSWER to #73 First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Daikin America, Inc. Discovery ends on 9/19/2022.(Underwood, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/25/2022 to edit text (jra).
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Joint MOTION to Coordinate Deadlines. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/12/22. (jra)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Joint MOTION to Coordinate Deadlines by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., City of Summerville, Ga, Earl Parris, Jr., Huntsman International LLC, Town of Trion, Georgia, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Daikin America Inc., and 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Droze, William) Modified on 4/11/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Intervenor COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Huntsman International, LLC, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, and Town of Trion, Georgia filed by City of Summerville, Georgia.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Proposed Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville's Amended Motion to Intervene #84 , DENIES Defendant Daikin America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #86 , GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendant Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #87 , DENIES Defendant Ryan Dejuan Jarrett's Motion to Dismiss #88 , DENIES Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Dismiss #89 , DENIES Defendant Town of Trion's Motion to Dismiss #90 , DENIES Defendant Huntsman International, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #91 , DENIES Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #92 , DENIES as moot the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply #114 , and DENIES Defendant 3M Company and Daikin America, Inc.'s Motion to Strike #128 . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2022. (jra)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: Proposed Intervenor-Plaintiff City of Summerville's Motion to Intervene #79 is DENIED as moot in light of the Proposed Intervenor-Plaintiff City ofSummerville's Amended Motion to Intervene #84 . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/24/2022. (jra)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn E. Hopkins terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/17/2022. (jra)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to Withdraw Kathryn E. Hopkins as Attorney by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. (Hopkins, Kathryn) Modified on 2/17/2022 to edit text(jra).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Change of Address and Firm Name by 3M Company (Remar, Robert) Modified on 1/5/2022 to edit text (jra).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Lee Patterson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/17/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(anc)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice.by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #130 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lee Patterson added appearing on behalf of City of Summerville, Georgia (gas)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #129 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11457851). to attorney for correction re: correct date of admission for admitted courts. (gas)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #129 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11457851). Attorney Lee Patterson added appearing on behalf of City of Summerville, Georgia (gas)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 APPLICATION for Admission of Lee Patterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11457851).by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #128 MOTION to Strike #127 Reply to Response to Motion to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (jeh)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Strike #127 Reply to Response to Motion with Brief In Support by 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc.. (Remar, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint filed by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Friedman, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE re #124 Response (Non-Motion) Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc.. (Remar, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE re #124 Response (Non-Motion) Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Droze, William)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE re #123 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Davis, Gary)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE by Daikin America, Inc. Defendants 3M's and Daikin America, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (Casey, Steven)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gregory W. Blount terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/5/2021. (ah)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Withdraw Gregory W. Blount as Attorneyby Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blount, Gregory)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replyto Daikin's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ah)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE re #116 Notice Of Supplemental Authority filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Casey, Steven) Modified to edit text on 7/6/2021 (ah).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE re #116 Notice (Other) Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Nunez, E.)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE re #116 Notice (Other) Defendant 3M's Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A by Earl Parris, Jr re #116 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority (Davis, Gary)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE by Earl Parris, Jr of Supplemental Authority (Davis, Gary)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replyto Daikin's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Casey, Steven)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replyto Daikin's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sur-Reply)(Whitlock, James)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #92 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #88 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Him in the Amended Complaint, #91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY BRIEF re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Him in the Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett. (Pendergrast, Craig)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY BRIEF re #91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Huntsman International, LLC. (Fox, Benjamin)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY BRIEF re #92 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Allen, John)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Casey, Steven)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY BRIEF re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Droze, William)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting Petitioner Theodore M. Grossman's #105 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/9/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #105 APPLICATION for Admission of Theodore M. Grossman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017219).. Attorney Theodore M. Grossman added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (nmb)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Submission of #84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (ah)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 APPLICATION for Admission of Theodore M. Grossman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11017219).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Underwood, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Him in the Amended Complaint filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Jarret Return Card)(Whitlock, James)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE re #84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint filed by Daikin America, Inc.. (Casey, Steven)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE re #84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint filed by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting Petitioner Jeff Friedman's #80 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE re #84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Droze, William)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #93 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Persons by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Allen, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit McLendon v Phillip Services Corp)(Allen, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Fox, Benjamin)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 5B, #7 Brief)(Sheridan, Kimberly)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of 3M's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - EPA Fact Sheet on PFOA & PFOS, #3 Exhibit B - Summerville Water Notices, #4 Exhibit C - EPD PFOA and PFOS Information, #5 Exhibit D - City of Summerville PFOA PFOS Information)(Remar, Robert)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Him in the Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Pendergrast, Craig)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Industrial User Permit)(Droze, William)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Daikin America, Inc.. (Casey, Steven)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Marie Alexander on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (Alexander, Ann)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #80 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10952402). Attorney Jeffrey E. Friedman added appearing on behalf of City of Summerville, Georgia (cdg)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Amended Proposed Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Brief In Support)(Davis, Jesse)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting Petitioner Zach Burford's #76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Petitioner Jean C. Frizzell's #75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Petitioner Solace Kirkland Southwick's #74 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeff Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10952402).by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Davis, Jesse) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by City of Summerville, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Brief in Support)(Davis, Jesse)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #75 APPLICATION for Admission of Jean C. Frizzell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934633).. Attorney Jean C. Frizzell added appearing on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (nmb)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #74 APPLICATION for Admission of Solace Kirkland Southwick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934483).. Attorney Solace Kirkland Southwick added appearing on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (nmb)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #76 APPLICATION for Admission of Zach Burford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934658).. Attorney Zach Burford added appearing on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (nmb)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying as moot #31 , #38 , #59 , #60 , and #61 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/29/2021. (jpk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana Mesa on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (Mesa, Juliana)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 APPLICATION for Admission of Zach Burford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934658).by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 APPLICATION for Admission of Jean C. Frizzell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934633).by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 APPLICATION for Admission of Solace Kirkland Southwick Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10934483).by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Citizen Suit Notices)(Davis, Gary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Amend. Deadlines outlined within the order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/21/2021. (ah)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Consent MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, and for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitlock, James)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC to answer or respond to Plaintiffs expected Amended Complaint to and including the 21st (twenty first) day after Plaintiff files same. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/19/2021. (jkb) Modified on 4/20/2021 TO EDIT TEXT (jkb).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Allen, John)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Christopher Max Zygmont replacing attorney David L. Pardue. (Zygmont, Christopher)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION Joint Statement on Putative Class Communications by Earl Parris, Jr. (Whitlock, James)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by John Curtis Allen on behalf of Pulcra Chemicals, LLC (Allen, John)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #64 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time Regarding Preliminary Planning Deadlines. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/12/2021. (ah)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daikin America, Inc..(Underwood, William) Modified to edit text on 4/13/2021 (ah).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Early Planning Deadlines 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, Joint Planning Report with Brief In Support by 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Huntsman International, LLC, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Droze, William)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #62 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntsman International, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Huntsman Corporation for Huntsman International, LLC. (Fox, Benjamin)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Fox, Benjamin)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sheridan, Kimberly)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Daikin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Daikin America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint)(Casey, Steven)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Christopher Yeilding's #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/6/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting Kary Bryant Wolfe's #51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/6/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Steven F. Casey's #50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/6/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time. The time to hold the Rule 26(f) Conference is extended up to and including May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/5/2021. (ah)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #50 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven F. Casey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10872568). Attorney Steven F. Casey added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (cdg)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #52 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Yeilding Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872670). Attorney Christopher L. Yeilding added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (cdg)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Kary Bryant Wolfe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872647). Attorney Kary Bryant Wolfe added appearing on behalf of Daikin America, Inc. (cdg)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Petitioner Ann Marie Alexander #48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/2/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time For Rule 26(f) Conference by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Gary)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Yeilding Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872670).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Underwood, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Kary Bryant Wolfe Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10872647).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Underwood, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 APPLICATION for Admission of Steven F. Casey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10872568).by Daikin America, Inc.. (Underwood, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ryan Dejuan Jarrett Answer due 4/20/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/1/2021. (jeh)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #48 APPLICATION for Admission of Ann Marie Alexander Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ann Marie Alexander added appearing on behalf of Town of Trion, Georgia (cdg)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 APPLICATION for Admission of Ann Marie Alexander Pro Hac Vice.by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Kimberly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motions to Dismiss is extended up to and including April 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2021. (ah)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #46 APPLICATION for Admission of Ann Marie Alexander Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10862245). to attorney for correction re: courts to which admitted. (cdg)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of Ann Marie Alexander Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10862245).by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Kimberly) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Whitlock, James)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC to answer or respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and including Friday, April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/26/2021. (ah)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ryan Dejuan Jarrett. (Pendergrast, Craig)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig K. Pendergrast on behalf of Ryan Dejuan Jarrett (Pendergrast, Craig)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Town of Trion, Georgia, will have through and including April 8, 2021 to file its Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/25/2021. (ah)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pulcra Chemicals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Pulcra Chemicals, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Pardue, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent R.B. Pamplin Corporation of Portland, Oregon for Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Droze, William)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trion IUP)(Droze, William)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Town of Trion, Georgia. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant Huntsman International, LLC to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including Thursday, April 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/22/2021. (jeh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #32 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
March 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Corrected] with Brief In Support by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORRECTED AT #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Huntsman International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)(Fox, Benjamin) Modified on 3/22/2021 (ah).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin E. Fox on behalf of Huntsman International, LLC (Fox, Benjamin)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Persons by 3M Company. (Remar, Robert)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of 3M's Motion to Dismiss)(Remar, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Daikin America, Inc. It is ORDERED that DAI shall have up to and including April 8, 2021 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/18/2021. (ah)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daikin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, William)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Ryan Dejuan Jarrett served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Daikin America, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ryan Dejuan Jarrett. (rvb)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting James S. Whitlock's #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/8/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Gary A. Davis's #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/8/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Defendant Ryan Jarrett (Whitlock, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Town of Trion, Georgia served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Pulcra Chemicals, LLC served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. Huntsman International, LLC served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Earl Parris, Jr. 3M Company served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Whitlock, James)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gary A. Davis added appearing on behalf of Earl Parris, Jr. (cdg)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of James S. Whitlock Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James S. Whitlock added appearing on behalf of Earl Parris, Jr. (cdg)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of James S. Whitlock Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Huntsman International, LLC, Ryan Dejuan Jarrett, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Pulcra Chemicals, LLC, Town of Trion, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Summons Daikin, #2 Summons Huntsman, #3 Summons Niedrach, #4 Summons Pulcra, #5 Summons Jarrett, #6 Summons Mayor)(ah)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice. with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Ryan Jarrett (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Pulcra (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Mt. Vernon (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Huntsman International (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr Daikin (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Earl Parris, Jr 3M (Dean, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10754228). to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel's address. (cdg)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of James S. Whitlock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10754249). to attorney for correction re: Local Counsel's address. (cdg)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of James S. Whitlock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10754249). with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary A. Davis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10754228). with Brief In Support by Earl Parris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (bjh)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Earl Parris, Jr. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10751913) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/23/2021 to edit text (bjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parris v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Parris, Jr.
Represented By: James S. Whitlock
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Dean
Represented By: Thomas C. Causby
Represented By: Keith A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulcra Chemicals, LLC
Represented By: John Curtis Allen
Represented By: E. Peyton Nunez
Represented By: Christopher Max Zygmont
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Represented By: Robert Douglas Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.
Represented By: William Middleton Droze
Represented By: Gregory W. Blount
Represented By: Kathryn E. Hopkins
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Bailey
Represented By: Kadeisha West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dejuan Jarrett
Represented By: Craig K. Pendergrast
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman International, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin E. Fox
Represented By: Insiya F. Aziz
Represented By: Jean C. Frizzell
Represented By: Nathan M. Smith
Represented By: Solace Kirkland Southwick
Represented By: Zach Burford
Represented By: Juliana Mesa
Represented By: Laurie Ann Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Trion, Georgia
Represented By: Ann Marie Alexander
Represented By: Kimberly Council Sheridan
Represented By: Erich P. Nathe
Represented By: Katie S. Lonze
Represented By: Katherine Decker
Represented By: Leslie Kali Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Mark Christian King
Represented By: W. Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Robert B. Remar
Represented By: Monica Perdomo Witte
Represented By: Katherine Leigh D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Benjamin Phillip Harmon
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Sterling Gardner Culpepper, III
Represented By: John Sinnott
Represented By: Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr.
Represented By: Tatum Jackson
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Emma Harriett Cramer
Represented By: William Coleman McFerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Represented By: Kary Bryant Wolfe
Represented By: Steven F. Casey
Represented By: Christopher L. Yeilding
Represented By: William Emery Underwood
Represented By: James Robert Saywell
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Dyal
Represented By: Theodore M. Grossman
Represented By: James L. Hollis
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaplan, Jr
Represented By: Richard H. Deane, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: John Mann Johnson
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Represented By: Mary Parrish McCracken
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Blair Joseph Cash
Represented By: Donavan Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: John Mann Johnson
Represented By: Lana A. Olson
Represented By: Mary Parrish McCracken
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: Blair Joseph Cash
Represented By: Donavan Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: City of Summerville, Georgia
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Friedman
Represented By: Lee Patterson
Represented By: Jesse Anderson (Andy) Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?