14F Licensing N.V. v. Happy Feet International LLC
Plaintiff: 14F Licensing N.V.
Defendant: Happy Feet International LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00090
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of WooYoung Chang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10998076).. Attorney Woo Young Chang added appearing on behalf of 14F Licensing N.V. (nmb)
June 2, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony W. Brooks Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10998041).. Attorney Anthony W. Brooks added appearing on behalf of 14F Licensing N.V. (nmb)
June 2, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of John W. McIlvaine, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997735).. Attorney John W. McIlvaine, III added appearing on behalf of 14F Licensing N.V. (nmb)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of WooYoung Chang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10998076).by 14F Licensing N.V.. (Sherman, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony W. Brooks Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10998041).by 14F Licensing N.V.. (Sherman, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of John W. McIlvaine, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10997735).by 14F Licensing N.V.. (Sherman, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 24, 2021 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rlb)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Sherman, James)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a AO Form 120 or a Notice of Filing explaining why the AO Form 120 is not applicable to this case no later than COB 5/21/21. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/19/21. (bnw)
May 19, 2021 Submission of the AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (aaq)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Woo Young Chang. Clerk to follow-up by 5/28/2021. (nmb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John W. McIlvaine. Clerk to follow-up by 5/28/2021. (nmb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony W. Brooks. Clerk to follow-up by 5/28/2021. (nmb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 14F Licensing N.V. identifying Corporate Parent I4F International B.V. for 14F Licensing N.V.. (Sherman, James)
May 5, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (bjh)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Happy Feet International LLC. (bjh)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 14F Licensing N.V. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10953939) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 14F Licensing N.V. v. Happy Feet International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Feet International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 14F Licensing N.V.
Represented By: James Marx Sherman
Represented By: John W. McIlvaine, III
Represented By: Woo Young Chang
Represented By: Anthony W. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?