Malone et al v. Stoyeck et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Malone, Sharon Malone and Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc.
Defendant: Richard Stoyeck and Andre Labarbera
Case Number: 4:2021cv00130
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Sharon Malone, Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc., Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc. (Guiliano, Nicholas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 Petitioners' Memorandum in Opposition to #11 Counterclaim, Motion to Vacate by Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Director of Arbitration Removal, #2 Exhibit Panel Order for Imposition of Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Panel Order Motion to Amend)(Guiliano, Nicholas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM Seeking to Vacate FINRA Award to Plaintiffs dated May 27, 2021 filed against Timothy Malone, Sharone Malone and Sardis Cemetery Properties, Inc. filed by Andre Labarbera, Richard Stoyeck.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT ANSWER to Petition for Arbitration filed by Andre Labarbera, Richard Stoyeck.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Andre Labarbera. (ddm)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc., Timothy Malone, Sharon Malone. Richard Stoyeck served on 7/24/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Guiliano, Nicholas)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc., Timothy Malone, Sharon Malone. Andre Labarbera served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Guiliano, Nicholas)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicholas J. Guiliano. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/21/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm)
July 21, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Nicholas J. Guiliano re #6 Order. (ddm)
July 21, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas J. Guiliano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11104944).. Attorney Nicholas J. Guiliano added appearing on behalf of Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc. (nmb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andre Labarbera, Richard Stoyeck. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc. for Richard Stoyeck (Doss, Jason)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc. for Andre LaBarbera (Doss, Jason)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas J. Guiliano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11104944). with Brief In Support by Sharon Malone, Timothy Malone, Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc.. (Doss, Jason) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm arbitration award filed by Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc., Timothy Malone, Sharon Malone. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC11095023) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. Stoyeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Malone
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Nicholas J. Guiliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Malone
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Nicholas J. Guiliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sardis Cemetery Properties Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Doss
Represented By: Nicholas J. Guiliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stoyeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Labarbera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?