Grange Insurance Company v. Cycle-Tex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grange Mutual Casualty Company and Grange Insurance Company
Defendant: Cycle-Tex, Inc. and Jarrod Johnson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00147
Filed: August 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Lutz, Hirlye)
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Hirlye R. Lutz, III on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (Lutz, Hirlye)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Tapley, F.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Jerome Tapley on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (Tapley, F.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Thompson, Brett)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Cooper Thompson on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (Thompson, Brett)
August 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Hiryle Ray Lutz, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212662). Attorney Hirlye R. Lutz, III added appearing on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (cdg)
August 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Brett Cooper Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212659). Attorney Brett Cooper Thompson added appearing on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (cdg)
August 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nina Towle Herring Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212680). Attorney Nina Towle Herring added appearing on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (cdg)
August 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Frank Jerome Tapley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11212638). Attorney F. Jerome Tapley added appearing on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (cdg)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #13 , #14 , #15 , and #16 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/30/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Nina Towle Herring Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212680).by Jarrod Johnson. (Stone, Ryals) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Hiryle Ray Lutz, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212662).by Jarrod Johnson. (Stone, Ryals) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Brett Cooper Thompson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11212659).by Jarrod Johnson. (Stone, Ryals) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Frank Jerome Tapley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11212638).by Jarrod Johnson. (Stone, Ryals) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Grange Insurance Company. Cycle-Tex, Inc. served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Lewis, Zachary)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Sims Stone on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (Stone, William)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryals Drayton Stone on behalf of Jarrod Johnson (Stone, Ryals)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Grange Insurance Company. Jarrod Johnson waiver mailed on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Lewis, Zachary)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Lewis, Zachary)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (Lewis, Zachary)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Underlying Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Reservation of Rights, #4 Exhibit Underlying Third-Party Complaint)(Lewis, Zachary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/10/2021 to add text (rlb).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/9/21. (rlb)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jarrod Johnson. (rlb)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company (Lewis, Zachary)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cycle-Tex, Inc.. (tmf)
August 2, 2021 Summons to Jarrod Johnson at #1 Complaint not issued. No address on form. (tmf)
August 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11150803) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Underlying Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Reservation of Rights, #4 Exhibit Underlying Third-Amended Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #6 Summons Jarrod Johnson (not issued, no address)) (tmf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Insurance Company v. Cycle-Tex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Zachary Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cycle-Tex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Johnson
Represented By: Brett Cooper Thompson
Represented By: F. Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Hirlye R. Lutz, III
Represented By: Nina Towle Herring
Represented By: Ryals Drayton Stone
Represented By: William Sims Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?