George et al v. Dean
Plaintiff: Matthew L George and Mary K Thiele
Defendant: Beatrice Lynn Dean
Case Number: 4:2021cv00195
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/22/21. (jpa)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00922. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Venue [Dkt. No. 5] is GRANTED IN PART, and it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be transferred to the Northern District of Georgia, Rome Division; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Dkt. No. 8] be and is DENIED as moot.Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/22/21. (yguy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2021. Pro se pltf and deft counsel appeared. Court advised of case status. Motions argued. #5 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2)is DENIED AS MOOT. Court orders that case be transferred to Northern District of Georgia (Rome division). (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 Letter to the Court, filed by Matthew L George and Mary K Thiele. (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matthew L George, Mary K Thiele re #18 Order. (jpa)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Rathlev on behalf of Beatrice Lynn Dean (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro, filed by Matthew L George, Mary K Thiele. (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beatrice Lynn Dean as to Michael L. George, waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro,., #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro,., #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/22/2021 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro,., #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro,. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Brief in Support to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro,. filed by Beatrice Lynn Dean. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) with Roseboro,. by Beatrice Lynn Dean. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beatrice Lynn Dean. Beatrice Lynn Dean waiver sent on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Notice of Correction re #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro. Thank you for your recent electronic filing with the Eastern District of Virginia. Unfortunately, document #5 number was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date that sets the motion for a Friday docket. Your motion will not be ruled on until you have filed a Notice of Hearing Date setting the motion for an appropriate Friday docket or all parties concerned have filed a Notice of Waiver of oral Argument. (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro,. filed by Beatrice Lynn Dean. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, transfer venue with Roseboro,. by Beatrice Lynn Dean. (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Rathlev on behalf of Beatrice Lynn Dean (Rathlev, Christopher) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 14683091331 (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beatrice Lynn Dean. (choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beatrice Lynn Dean ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 14683091331.), filed by Matthew L George, Mary K Thiele. (Attachments: #1 Attached Complaint, #2 State Court Records Filed October 15, 2020, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(choy, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K Thiele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Lynn Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?