Swinney v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Swinney
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC and Viatris, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00090
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen Swinney. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Ortho Evra Supplement List, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Xulane Supplement List)(Lock, Nathan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Stephen Swinney.(Lock, Nathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/23/2022. (dob)
May 23, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Deadlines with Brief In Support by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Consent Motion to Stay Discovery and Other Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Johnson, Myrece)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to 6/3/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 5/20/2022. (dob)
May 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss by Stephen Swinney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lock, Nathan) Modified on 5/18/2022 (dob).
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - DHHS letter, #3 Exhibit B - Xulane pamphet)(Johnson, Myrece)
April 26, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason M. Reefer re #10 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (tmf)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the request of Petitioner Jason M. Reefer to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/25/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clem C. Trischler. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/22/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #1 Notice of Removal,,, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Answer due 5/6/2022; Viatris Specialty, LLC Answer due 5/6/2022; Viatris, Inc. Answer due 5/6/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/22/2022. (dob)
April 22, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Clem C. Trischler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11748019). Attorney Clem C. Trischler added appearing on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc. (cdg)
April 22, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason M. Reefer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11748153). Attorney Jason M. Reefer added appearing on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc. (cdg)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason M. Reefer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11748153).by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc.. (Marsh, C.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Clem C. Trischler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11748019).by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc.. (Marsh, C.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Clem C. Trischler. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2022. (gas)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jason M. Reefer. Clerk to follow-up by 5/2/2022. (gas)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Viatris, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Johnson, Myrece)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Viatris, Inc., Viatris Specialty, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11735797) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Complete Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Superior Court of Murray County Complete Court file, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in Superior Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinney v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Swinney
Represented By: Nathan D. Lock
Represented By: Samuel L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viatris Specialty, LLC
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viatris, Inc.
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?