Catoosa County Republican Party et al v. Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration et al
Plaintiff: Catoosa County Republican Party and Joannna Hildreath
Defendant: Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration, Tommy Davis, Ron McKelvy, Nina Crawford, Marvin Cornelison and Tonya Moore
Case Number: 4:2024cv00095
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Submission of #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
June 3, 2024 Submission of #23 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (sll)
May 17, 2024 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. (Johnson, Jordan)
May 3, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration, Marvin Cornelison, Nina Crawford, Tommy Davis, Ron McKelvy, Tonya Moore. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Harris, Christopher)
May 2, 2024 Filing 23 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration, Marvin Cornelison, Nina Crawford, Tommy Davis, Ron McKelvy, Tonya Moore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Christopher)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/23/24. (jpa)
April 18, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Chad Young and Christopher M. Harris on behalf of Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration (Young, C.) Modified on 4/19/2024 to add applicable filer (dob).
April 17, 2024 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2024 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Arguments heard. A ruling will be made at a later date. (Court Reporter Geraldine Glover)(jpa)
April 16, 2024 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Tonya Moore served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Tommy Davis served on 4/14/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Ron McKelvy served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Nina Crawford served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Marvin Cornelison served on 4/14/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Johnson, Jordan)
April 16, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED filed by Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration, Marvin Cornelison, Nina Crawford, Tommy Davis, Ron McKelvy, Tonya Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Harris, Christopher)
April 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Harris on behalf of Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration, Marvin Cornelison, Nina Crawford, Tommy Davis, Ron McKelvy, Tonya Moore (Harris, Christopher)
April 11, 2024 Notification of Docket Correction re #1 Complaint. Incorrect PDF attached. Clerk made necessary changes. (dob)
April 9, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Believed to Have Been Previously Filed against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath.(Johnson, Jordan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Injunction ; MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2024 at 09:30 AM in ROME Courtroom 300 before Judge William M. Ray II. Each side shall submit prior to the start of the hearing, a proposed order which includes findings of fact and conclusions of law for each motion being heard. Orders should be submitted by email. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/5/2024. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Oles, Sr on behalf of Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath (Oles, David)
April 5, 2024 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tonya Moore. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ron McKelvy. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tommy Davis. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Marvin Cornelison. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nina Crawford. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDby Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. (dob)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Catoosa County Republican Party, Joannna Hildreath. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC13342237) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2024: #2 Complaint) (dob).
April 5, 2024 Submission of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (dob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catoosa County Republican Party et al v. Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catoosa County Republican Party
Represented By: Catherine Scott Bernard
Represented By: Jordan Alexander Johnson
Represented By: David Edward Oles, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joannna Hildreath
Represented By: Catherine Scott Bernard
Represented By: Jordan Alexander Johnson
Represented By: David Edward Oles, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catoosa County Board of Elections and Voter Registration
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Davis
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron McKelvy
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Crawford
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Cornelison
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Moore
Represented By: C. Chad Young
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?