National Labor Relations Board v. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00291
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
2 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 EO: Pursuant to all counsel's request, the Show Cause Hearing set for 9/11/18 @ 9:30 AM is continued to 10/17/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00291-JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint RESPONDENT SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.S ANSWER TO APPLICANT NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARDS APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING OBEDIENCE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, FILED JULY 31, 2018 by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard M. Rand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Rand, Richard)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board (Kakuda, Trent)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing is set for 9/11/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/13/2018. (cib, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Court will assess case status on Monday, October 29, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/31/2018. (afc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00291-LEK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Application for Order Requiring Obedience to Subpoena Duces Tecum against Securitas Security Services USA, Inc., filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application, #2 Declaration Declaration of Trent Kakuda, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I to Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K to Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L to Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M to Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N to Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O to Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit P to Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit R to Declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit S to Declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit T to Declaration, #23 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #24 Proposed Order to Enforce Subpoena, #25 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kakuda, Trent) Modified on 7/31/2018: Filing event modified to MOTION. (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Dale K. Yashiki
Represented By: Trent K. Kakuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?