Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. Myles Baldridge et al

Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Doe 1, Doe 5, Doe 4, Doe 3, Doe 2, Myles Baldridge and Doe 6
Case Number: 1:2018cv00298
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Outside state of Hawaii
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 21 REPORT of Planning Meeting PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) AND LR 26.1.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 13, 2018 20 EO: On 9/10/18, Defendant Myles Baldridge filed a letter requesting 45 days to respond to the lawsuit. Insofar as Defendant is proceeding pro se, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court GRANTS the request #17 and extends the deadline to respond to the Complaint until 10/29/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 13, 2018 19 EO: Myles Baldridge is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/18 @ 9:00 a.m. Mr. Baldridge to provide his contact number to the courtroom manager, Toni Fujinaga, at 541-1297. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 11, 2018 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. Myles Baldridge served on 8/24/2018. (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 9/12/2018 (emt, ).
September 10, 2018 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and REQUEST to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on November 19, 2018 - by Defendant Myles Baldridge. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 6, 2018 16 EO: Pursuant to Kerry Culpepper's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/19/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/12/18.(Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
September 5, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00298 JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist) Modified on 9/6/2018 to correct initials and regenerate NEF.(apg, dist).
August 31, 2018 14 EO: On 8/29/18, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons. Plaintiff requests an extension of 45 days, or until 12/19/18, to serve Defendants. Good cause appearing therefor, the Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion #13 and HEREBY extends the deadline to effect service until 12/19/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)
August 29, 2018 13 EX PARTE Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 13, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re: #6 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/13/2018. (afc)
August 9, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Myles Baldridge. (afc)
August 8, 2018 10 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 6, 2018 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
August 6, 2018 8 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 6, 2018 7 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/1/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 6, 2018 6 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 6, 2018 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00298-JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 6, 2018 3 NOTICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 6, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against MYLES BALDRIDGE, DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2070754.), filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. Myles Baldridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myles Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?