Char v. KHON et al

Plaintiff: Mark Alan Char
Defendant: KHNL, John and Jane Does 1-50, KHON and KITV
Interested Party: Shelley Nobriga, Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2018cv00304
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KHNL, KHON, KITV, John and Jane Does 1-50, filed by Mark Alan Char. (Attachments: #1 Letter addressed to Clerk Sue Beitia, #2 mailing documentation)(cib, )
September 21, 2018 4 Letter addressed to Clerk from Mark Alan Char, dated August 29, 2018. (The letter(s) are only entered in CV 18-00304 LEK-KJM) (Attachments: #1 reverse side of Letter, #2 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 21, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, blank prisoner civil rights complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Mark Alan Char. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Copy of #3 Order mailed to OCCC Warden and Financial Office at the address: Oahu Community Correctional Center: 2199 Kamehameha Highway Honolulu, HI 96819. Shelley Nobriga and Laurie Nadamoto notified by NEF. Copy of order placed in the District of Hawaii's finance box (cib, )
August 21, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER (1) Granting In Forma Pauperis Application; and (2) Dismissing Complaint re: #2 #1 ."(1) Char's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner is GRANTED.(2) Char's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of federal jurisdiction.(3) Char may file an amended pleading that cures the jurisdictional deficiency of his Complaint on or before September 20, 2018, if this is possible and donein good faith. In the alternative, Char may notify the court in writing that he elects to voluntarily dismiss this action on or before September 20, 2018. Uponreceipt of such written notice, the court will vacate the Order Granting In Forma Pauperis and waive further payment of fees.(4) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Char a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he may comply with this Order." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/21/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2018 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Mark Alan Char. (emt, )
August 7, 2018 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded; Stay Pending Trial against All Defendants - filed by Mark Alan Char. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Char v. KHON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHNL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KITV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Nobriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Char
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?