Venice PI, LLC v. Yangrelig et al
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC
Defendant: Doe 1, Marvin Yangrelig, Doe 4, Doe 3 and Doe 2
Case Number: 1:2018cv00310
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 EO: Pursuant to Kerry Culpepper's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 12/28/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/21/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Marvin Yangrelig. (emt, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 18-00310 JAO-KSC on all further pleadings . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/05/2018. (apg, dist)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 EO: On 8/17/18, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons. Plaintiff requests an extension of 45 days, or until 12/23/18, to serve Defendants. Good cause appearing therefor, the Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion #11 and HEREBY extends the deadline to effect service until 12/23/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(chang1)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 EX PARTE Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re: #8 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/15/2018. (afc)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26 (F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Venice PI, LLC Copyright Report Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00310 JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Venice PI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lost Dog Productions, LLC, Other Affiliate Voltage Productions, LLC for Venice PI, LLC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against DOE, Marvin Yangrelig ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2073645.), filed by Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venice PI, LLC v. Yangrelig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Yangrelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?