Diaz v. Medcah Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Diaz
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Medcah Inc. and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00316
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #6 Summons Issued, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint, Two Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons forms (AO 398), Two Waiver of Service of Summons Forms (A0 399), and instruction sheet has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Edward Diaz. Copy of #5 Order Granting Plaintiff's Application To Proceed Without Repaying Fees Or Costs and Directing Service placed in the U.S. Marshals box in the clerk's office. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Medcah Inc. (cib, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Application To Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Service re #2 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/20/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Edward Diaz. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-316-SOM-KSC on all further pleadings. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Edward Diaz. (cib, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Common Law against Medcah Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, filed by Edward Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to complaint, #2 Exhibit B to complaint, #3 Exhibit C to complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Medcah Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medcah Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?