Diaz v. Argon Agency Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Diaz
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10 and Argon Agency Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 EO: In light of the #12 Summons Returned Executed and the allow parties sufficient time to meet and confer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/17/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/23/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Argon Agency Inc served on 6/24/2019 filed by Edward Diaz. (cib) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 original signature) (cib, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Argon Agency Inc.. (cib)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/13/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 7/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. If not already filed, the Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/10/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 EO: In light of the #8 Summons Returned Executed as to Defendant Argon Agency Inc. and to allow defendant sufficient time to answer the complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/20/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 06/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/06/2019. Plaintiff Edward Diaz has been notified via telephone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Edward Diaz. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
May 7, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. According to F.R.C.P 4(b) - Summons Issuance. On or after filing the complaint, the plaintiff may present a summons to the clerk for signature and seal. If the summons is properly completed, the clerk must sign, seal, and issue it to the plaintiff for service on the defendant. A summons or a copy of a summons that is addressed to multiple defendants must be issued for each defendant to be served. Plaintiff ommitted to bring the summons to the Clerk's office to issue summons for Defendant Aargon Agency Inc. Defendant accepted service on 5/7/2019. (cib)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Argon Agency Inc served on 5/7/2019 filed by Edward Diaz. (cib)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400.00(PAID), receipt number HI026334 re #1 Complaint. (cib)
April 11, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry, #6 Original Request has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Edward Diaz. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
April 11, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #6 Request filed by Edward Diaz is not signed. The Clerk's Office will return a copy of the document to Mr. Diaz. Mr. Diaz is instructed to sign the document and return it to the Clerk's Office. (cib)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 EO: The court grants Plaintiff's request for an extension until April 18, 2019, of the time in which to pay the filing fee for this action. However, the court once again urges Plaintiff to avoid any needless expenditure of time and money. For example, Plaintiff may want to contact Defendant to see if his dispute can be resolved without further activity in court. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST To Afford More Time To Make The Payment For This Action to April 18th, 2019 filed by Edward Diaz.(plaintiff's signature omitted) (cib) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/2/2019 with Plaintiff's wet signature) (cib, ).
March 22, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Edward Diaz. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #2 .No later than April 5, 2019, Diaz must pay the filing fee. If Diaz fails to timely pay the filing fee, this action will be automatically dismissed on or after April 8, 2019. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/22/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 5/20/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Edward Diaz. (cib)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Common Law; Exhibits A-C against Argon Agency Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10 filed by Edward Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Argon Agency Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argon Agency Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?