Venice PI, LLC, et al v. Doe 1, et al
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc. and MON, LLC
Defendant: Doe 1, Brent Baldwin, Doe 2, Michael Nolasco, Doe 3 and Does 4-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00169
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's requests set forth in the #33 Scheduling Conference Statement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/11/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 08/20/2019. Counsel Kerry S. Culpepper to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 7, 2019 Filing 34 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #27 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REQUEST ISSUANCE OF ORDER GRANTING LETTERS OF REQUEST PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND ORDER GRANTING SAID LETTERS OF REQUESTS, 32 Applicable Party,, Order, Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and ORDER. Defendant CULLEN COUGHLAN (AKA Defendant DOE 3) is hereby PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from directly, contributorily or indirectly infringing Plaintiffs rights in their motion pictures, including without limitation by using the Internet to reproduce or copy any of Plaintiffs motion pictures, except pursuant to a lawful written license from Plaintiffs. (cib)
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 EO: To allow additional time for Plaintiffs to serve the Complaint and Defendants to file their answers, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/03/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/11/2019, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 07/03/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
May 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #29 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT BRENT BALDWIN has been served by First Class Mail to Brent Baldwin at 5 Kempf St., Kittery, ME 03904 on May 23, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT BRENT BALDWIN - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (emt, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brent Baldwin served on 5/8/2019 filed by UN4 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 5/14/2019 to add service date (cib).
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REQUEST ISSUANCE OF ORDER GRANTING LETTERS OF REQUEST PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE AND ORDER GRANTING SAID LETTERS OF REQUESTS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Declaration of MICHAEL NOLASCO, #4 Declaration of BRENT BALDWIN, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(Culpepper, Kerry)
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on 5/10/2019 as to Doe 3 by UN4 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. Doe 3 waiver sent on 4/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 5/14/2019 (cib).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 41 and ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/9/2019. (cib)
May 8, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Planning Meeting between Plaintiffs and Defendant Brent Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EO: Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request ("Motion") seeks an order issuing letters of request pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 28(d)(1). ECF No. 21. The Motion, however, disregards Rule 26(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which provides that "a party may not seek discovery from any source before the parties have conferred as required by Rule 26(f)," except in certain specified circumstances, or by order of the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d); see also ECF No. 5; LR26.1. The record reflects that Plaintiffs have held a Rule 26(f) conference with Defendants Mike Nolasco and Doe 3, but none of the other defendants. The Court therefore DENIES the Motion. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 05/07/2019. (mansfield2)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael Nolasco on 4/21/2019 filed by UN4 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. answer due 6/4/2019. (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified docket text on 5/3/2019 to add acceptance date (cib).
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 25, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Planning Meeting between Plaintiffs and Defendants Mike Nolasco and DOE 3 (Cullen Coughlan). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APRIL 15, 2019 FILING. re #18 Summons Issued. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Doe 2. (cib)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 EO: COURT ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. re #7 EX PARTE Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC re #7 EX PARTE Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 EP: Status Conference held on 4/11/2019. (Court Reporter Debi Read) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Michael Nolasco. (cib)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. re #7 EX PARTE Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Status Conference is set for 4/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Brent Baldwin. (cib)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, UN4 Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Declaration of Yunger, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS - Copyright Report and Complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights at 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (cib)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00169-LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright Report Continued)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc, TBV Productions, LLC, UN4 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lost Dog Productions, LLC, Other Affiliate Voltage Productions, LLC for Venice PI, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for TBV Productions, LLC; Corporate Parent Soundford Limited for MON, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Exhibits 1-3; Declaration of Eric Smith FOR CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, INTENTIONAL INDUCEMENT, AND DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2181645.), filed by UN4 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration of Eric Smith, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venice PI, LLC, et al v. Doe 1, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nolasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBV Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UN4 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MON, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?