Department of Education, State of Hawaii et al v. T. et al
Plaintiff: Christina Kishimoto and Department of Education, State of Hawaii
Defendant: Leeann T., Wayne T. and Acen T.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00259
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants and Cross-Claimants. (Varady, Carl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement PLAINTIFFS STATE OF HAWAII, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Murakami, Kris)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON APPEAL: (PART 3 OF 3) TRANSCRIPT, MARCH 14, 2019 (VOLUME II) - submitted by the Department of the Attorney General Office of Dispute Resolution. (SEALED) RETAINED (emt, ) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2019: #1 Transcript of Proceedings, held on March 14, 2019) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2019: #2 Transcript of Proceedings, held March 13, 2019 (includes CD) ) (emt, ). Modified on 7/19/2019 (emt, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON APPEAL: (PART 2 OF 3) TRANSCRIPT, MARCH 13, 2019 (VOLUME I) - submitted by the Department of the Attorney General Office of Dispute Resolution. (SEALED) RETAINED (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #1 Transcript of Proceedings, held on March 13, 2019 ) (emt, ). Modified on 7/12/2019 (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #2 Transcript of Proceedings, held March 13, 2019 (includes CD) ) (emt, ). Modified on 7/12/2019 (emt, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON APPEAL (PART 1 OF 3) (PETITIONER'S WITNESS LIST, EXHIBIT LIST, AND EXHIBITS; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE & DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, STATE OF HAWAII'S WITNESS LIST, EXHIBIT LIST, AND EXHIBITS; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) - submitted by the Department of the Attorney General Office of Dispute Resolution. (SEALED) RETAINED (emt, ) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #1 Petitioners' Witness List, Exhibit List, and Exhibits; Certificate of Service , #2 Exhibit 1.1, #3 Exhibits 2.1-2.14, #4 Exhibits 3.1-3.3, #5 Exhibits 4.1-4.36, #6 Exhibits 5.1-5.2, #7 Exhibit 6.1, #8 Exhibits 7.1-7.2, #9 Exhibits 8.1-8.17, #10 Exhibits 9.1-9.4, #11 Exhibit 10.1, #12 Exhibits 11.1-11.2, #13 Exhibits 12.1-12.3) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #14 Department of Education, State of Hawaii's Witness List, Exhibit List, and Exhibits; Certificate of Service , #15 DOE00019-DOE00042, #16 DOE00043-DOE00069, #17 DOE00070-DOE00335, #18 DOE00433-DOE00560, #19 DOE00562-DOE00690) (emt, ). Modified on 7/12/2019 (emt, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON APPEAL - submitted by Department of the Attorney General Office of Dispute Resolution. (SEALED) RETAINED (emt, ) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #1 Pages 00001-00004, #2 Pages 00005-00009, #3 Pages 00010-00013, #4 Pages 00014-00020, #5 Pages 00021-00022, #6 Pages 00023-00027, #7 Pages 00028-00030, #8 Pages 00031-00035, #9 Pages 00036-00038, #10 Pages 00039-00040, #11 Pages 00041-00043, #12 Page 00044, #13 Pages 00045-00050, #14 Pages 00051-00052, #15 Pages 00053-00055, #16 Pages 00056-00081, #17 Pages 00082-00111, #18 Page 00112-00113, #19 CD-R (In re: AT v. DOE, et al., DOE-SY 1819-022, PHC 12/15/18) ) (emt, ). Modified on 7/12/2019 (emt, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: TRANSMITTAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ON APPEAL ; Index to Certified Administrative Record on Appeal ; Certification of Record; Certificate of Service - submitted by the Department of the Attorney General, Office of Dispute Resolution. (Attachments: #1 Index to Certified Administrative Record on Appeal, #2 Certification of Record, #3 Certificate of Service) (emt, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTER-CLAIMS against Department of Education, State of Hawaii by Wayne T., Acen T., Leeann T..(Varady, Carl) Modified on 6/21/2019 (emt, ).
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/22/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00259 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Exhibit A; Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2205730.), filed by Department of Education, State of Hawaii, Christina Kishimoto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Main Document Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murakami, Kris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Department of Education, State of Hawaii et al v. T. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeann T.
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne T.
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acen T.
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Kishimoto
Represented By: Kris S. Murakami
Represented By: Holly T. Shikada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Education, State of Hawaii
Represented By: Kris S. Murakami
Represented By: Holly T. Shikada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?