Galera v. Social Security Admin et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Galera
Defendant: Social Security Admin, HMSA, Queen's West Oahu, Queen's Medical Center, Gregory Yuen, M.D., Glorifin Belmonte, M.D., Jeffrey Miles, M.D., Aurora Mariani, M.D., Luke Xier, NP, Dr. Young, M.D., Calvin Alonzo, M.D., Sorbella Guilermo, M.D., Mark Dithner, Michael Brodsky, M.D., Christa, Davilo Ablan, M.D., Ray Romero, M.D., Melisa Mejano, NP, Carolyn Rowe, D.V.R., Hina Mauka, Family Peace Center / Anger Mgnt., Long's Drug Store Pharmacist, Goodwill Human Resources Director, Pact Anger Management Trainer, Eric Acuna, Symphonie / Waianae Comprehensive Center, Mellisa Bauer, Dr. Kiho, Dr. Frantini, Tasha, Supervisor, Rory Chandler, Lorie Kim Ryan, Ian Nakamura, Social Security Law Judge, FBI, State of Hawaii Probation Office, Waianae Coast Comprehensive and First Hawaiian Bank P.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00372
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 EO: In light of the #20 Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend issued by CHIEF Judge J. Michael Seabright on allowing Plaintiff time to amend his pleading on or before November 18, 2021, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/01/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 12/02/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 11/26/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re: #16 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/19/2021. (1) The Amended Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1). (2) Plaintiff may amend his pleading by curing the noted deficiencies in his claims on or before November 18, 2021. (3) Failure to timely file an amended pleading may result inAUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this suit without further notice. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jeffrey P. Galera will be served by First Class Mail on October 19, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF).
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 Letter addressed to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Jeffrey Galera Re: Amendments to Civil Complaint, dated October 12, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (eta)
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Amended Complaint - filed by Jeffrey P. Galera Note: Attachments 2, 5, 6 are restricted as they contains personal identifiers (Attachments: #1 CDs From February 2021 Hearing (CDs Retained in Clerk's Office), #2 Banking Documents, #3 State of Hawaii - First Circuit Court Documents, #4 USDC Hawaii Case Documents, #5 Social Security Administration Documents, #6 Medical Records, #7 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Amended Complaint - filed by Jeffrey P. GaleraMedical Records are restricted as they contain personal identifiers (Attachments: #1 Master WS List - List of Defendants, #2 Medical Records)(jni)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Jeffrey P. Galera Medical Records are Exhibit A is restricted as it contains personal identifiers (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Medical Records Exhibit A)(jni) Docket Text Modified on 9/30/2021 (jni)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 EO: On September 24, 2021, the court received two letters from pro se Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Galera. ECF Nos. #13 , #14 . Dated September 20, 2021, ECF No. #14 at PageID # 81, and September 21, 2021, ECF No. #13 at PageID # 78, the letters appear to be another attempt by Plaintiff to add additional defendants to his Complaint filed on August 31, 2021. Compare ECF Nos. #13 , #14 , with ECF Nos. #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 .But on September 17, 2021, the court dismissed the Complaint without prejudice, and granted Plaintiff until October 15, 2021 to file an amended complaint that cures the noted deficiencies. See ECF No. #12 . Accordingly, Plaintiff's September 20 and 21, 2021 letters are MOOT, and the court will take no further action on them. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 [Letter] To: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subject: Main & Secondary Defendants (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 24, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - copies of ECF Nos. #13 , #14 were served by First Class Mail on September 24, 2021 to Jeffrey Galera at the address of record. (jo)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 [Letters] To: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subjects: Secondary Defendant, Statement and Explaination [sic] of Evidence (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION, ECF NO. #3 ; AND (2) DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ECF NO. #1 , WITH LEAVE TO AMEND - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/17/2021. (1) Plaintiff's IFP Application is GRANTED. (2) The Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b)(1). (3) Plaintiff may amend his pleading by curing the noted deficiencies in his claims on or before October 15, 2021. (4) Failure to timely file an amended pleading may result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this suit without further notice. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jeffrey P. Galera will be served by First Class Mail on September 20, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF).
September 17, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - copies of ECF Nos. #8 , #9 , #10 , and #11 were served by First Class Mail on September 16, 2021 to Jeffrey Galera at the address of record. (jo)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 Memo to: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subject: More Main and Secondary Defendants; Last 5 witnesses (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 [Letter] To: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subject: Main Defendant and Secondary Defendant (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 [Letter] To: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subject: Last 5 Witnesses (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Memo to: Judge Seabright from Jeffrey Galera, Subject: More Main and Secondary Defendants (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00372 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 EO: The Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge assigned to this action. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield3)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 11/1/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Jeffrey P. Galena was served.
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) - filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey P. Galera (jo)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - filed by Jeffrey P. Galera (jo)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS against All Defendants - filed by Jeffrey P. Galera Exhibits B and C are restricted as they contain personal identifiers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galera v. Social Security Admin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P. Galera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen's West Oahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Yuen, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glorifin Belmonte, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Miles, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Mariani, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Xier, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Young, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Alonzo, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorbella Guilermo, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dithner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brodsky, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davilo Ablan, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Romero, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melisa Mejano, NP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Rowe, D.V.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hina Mauka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Peace Center / Anger Mgnt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long's Drug Store Pharmacist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Human Resources Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pact Anger Management Trainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Acuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symphonie / Waianae Comprehensive Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellisa Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kiho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frantini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Kim Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Nakamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Law Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waianae Coast Comprehensive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Hawaiian Bank P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?