Shimose v. International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142 et al
Plaintiff: Zak Shimose
Defendant: International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142, National Labor Relations Board and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00489
Filed: December 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 20 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 31, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 21-00489 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - All parties have been served electronically at the e-mail addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 31, 2022.
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND DENY APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #1 , #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/31/2022. Based on the foregoing, the Court RECOMMENDS that the district court DISMISS the Complaint without prejudice and DENY the Application as moot. The Court RECOMMENDS that the district court GRANT Plaintiff leave to amend. If the district court dismisses the Complaint, Plaintiff must timely file an amended complaint as directed by the district court. Plaintiff must also either file an IFP Application or pay the required filing fee as directed by the district court. Failure to meet these requirements should result in an automatic dismissal. Due to the lack of full consent of the parties under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), the Clerk of Court is directed to REASSIGN this case to a district judge. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - All parties have been served electronically at the e-mail addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 31, 2022.
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 EO: On 12/12/21, Plaintiff filed an [ECF #4 ] Application for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing. Plaintiff's Application is approved. However, Plaintiff's [ECF #5 ] Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ("Application") is pending before this Court. Until the Court issues a decision on the Application, Plaintiff shall not file any motions.Further, Plaintiff is reminded that Plaintiff is required to "abide by all local, federal, and other applicable rules and/or statutes." LR81.1(a). Any misuse or abuse of e-filing privileges may result in the revocation or termination of permission to participate in electronic filing in this case. Further, failure to abide by the Local Rules may result in sanctions, including but not limited to entry of default judgment or dismissal of this case with prejudice. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 19, 2022 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Conference of Parties Report; Certificate of Service - by Zak Shimose. (eta)
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 EO: Per Plaintiff's request, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 4/8/2022 at 09:00AM. Scheduling Conference Statements must be filed by 4/1/2022. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 Consent Election Form
December 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell K.Y. Chun-Hoon on behalf of International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142 on behalf of International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142. (Chun-Hoon, Lowell)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed on 12/12/2021 by International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142.(Yeung, Eve)
December 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve L. Y. Yeung on behalf of International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142 on behalf of International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142. (Yeung, Eve)
December 30, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY-Re: Document #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Eve Yeung~ Please be advised that the Notice of Appearance reflects that Attorneys Lowell K.Y. Chun-Hoon and Eve L.Y. Yeung are appearing as co-counsel for Defendant International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142. The Notice is e-filed by Eve Yeung. It is recommended that a Notice of Appearance be submitted by each attorney, using their respective CM/ECF accounts. The filing system will prompt the specific attorney, whose login is used, to associate to the case. For information concerning CM/ECF registration, the filing party may refer to the Court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov., see "CM/ECF Resources". (jni)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT re #7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - filed by Zak Shimose. (eta)
December 18, 2021 Filing 9 Consent Election Form (jo)
December 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. (FILING INSTRUCTIONS ATTACHED). While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Zak Shimose served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/7/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(eta)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Zak Shimose served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
December 12, 2021 Filing 6 (Proposed) Summons - by Zak Shimose. (eta)
December 12, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Zak Shimose (eta)
December 12, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-File) (Pro Se Non-Prisoner) - by Zak Shimose (Attachments: #1 CM/ECF Application) (eta)
December 12, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filing by Email - by Zak Shimose. (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide re: NEFs) (eta)
December 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Zak Shimose. (eta)
December 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against All Defendants - filed by Zak Shimose.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shimose v. International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zak Shimose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 142
Represented By: Eve L. Y. Yeung
Represented By: Lowell K.Y. Chun-Hoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?