Center for Biological Diversity v. National Marine Fisheries Service
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service, Gina Raimondo and Janet Coit
Case Number: 1:2023cv00306
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn F. Cook on behalf of Janet Coit, National Marine Fisheries Service, Gina Raimondo on behalf of Janet Coit, National Marine Fisheries Service, Gina Raimondo. (Cook, Caitlyn)
August 16, 2023 Filing 21 EO: In order to allow the Defendants time to answer the complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/25/2023 to 11/7/2023 at 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. Janet Coit, National Marine Fisheries Service, Gina Raimondo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Return receipts and delivery confirmations. Service executed 7/31/2023 on the U.S. Attorney's office. Service executed 8/2/2023 on NMFS. Service executed 8/4/2023 on Sec'y Raimondo. Service executed 8/7/2023 on Assist. Adm'r Coit and the Attorney General. Answer due by 9/29/2023.)(Jeffers, Emily)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO EMILY JEFFERS re #17 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/27/2023. (eta)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SARAH UHLEMANN re #16 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/27/2023. (eta)
July 27, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Emily Jeffers) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2871484.Maxx Elizabeth Phillips appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Phillips, Maxx)
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Sarah Uhlemann) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2871470.Maxx Elizabeth Phillips appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to the Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Janet Coit. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Gina Raimondo. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/25/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/26/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/27/2023 to omit extraneous attachments (i.e. Civil Waiver Packet) ) (eta). Modified on 7/27/2023 (eta).
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00306 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2870675.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Maxx) Modified on 7/26/2023 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Emily Jeffers
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Caitlyn F. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Raimondo
Represented By: Caitlyn F. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Coit
Represented By: Caitlyn F. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?