Parr v. Board of Trustees for the Twin Falls Public Library Featured Case

First Amendment claim by patron who says he was denied access to library computers. Dismissed because patron did not claim actual injury - he was able to use computers at another library.

Plaintiff: William Louis Parr
Defendant: Board of Trustees for the Twin Falls Public Library
Case Number: 1:2006cv00204
Filed: May 25, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Twin Falls - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2006 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Pla's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Mikel H. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
September 27, 2006 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Louis Parr
May 30, 2006 Filing 7 CONSENT filed. (dks, )
May 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER plaintiff may file a notice of voluntary dismissal within the next 30 days or he shall be required to pay the filing fee of $350 in increments of $10 per month and his case shall be reassigned to the district court to consider dismissal. Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
May 25, 2006 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for William Louis Parr re 3 Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
May 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing -
May 25, 2006 Filing 3 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees for the Twin Falls Public Library , filed by William Louis Parr.
May 25, 2006 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Louis Parr.
May 25, 2006 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Louis Parr. Responses due by 6/19/2006

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parr v. Board of Trustees for the Twin Falls Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Louis Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees for the Twin Falls Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?