Klimes et al v. Menu Foods Featured Case

Plaintiff: Paul Lavoie, Larry Klimes and Richard Mueller
Defendant: Menu Foods
Case Number: 1:2007cv00160
Filed: April 5, 2007
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Mikel H. Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2007 19
Letter from MDL Panel (dks, )
July 10, 2007 18
NOTICE - Conditional Transfer Order. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the US District Court for the District of New Jersey. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 15 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 15 day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (ja)
July 5, 2007 17
NOTICE by Menu Foods -- Notice of Multidistrict Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 and Request to Maintain Stay (Anderson, Tyler)
June 18, 2007 16
Documents from MDL (ja, )
May 31, 2007 14
DOCUMENTS FROM MDL 1850 (ja, )
May 21, 2007 13
Documents from MDL 1850 (ja, )
May 14, 2007 12
Documents from MDL 1850 (ja, )
April 9, 2007 2
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Larry Klimes, Paul Lavoie, Richard Mueller re 1 Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klimes et al v. Menu Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lavoie
Represented By: Mick Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Klimes
Represented By: Bruce S Bistline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mueller
Represented By: Mick Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?