Gibson et al v. Credit Suisse Securities USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: L. J. Gibson and Beau Blixseth
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities USA, LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse AG, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. and Credit Suisse Cayman Islands Branch
Case Number: 1:2010cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER re 885 Motion for Reconsideration filed by L. J. Gibson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Objection to Memorandum of Decision and Order (Dkt. 885 ) is DENIED. The Order on Remand and Memorandum Decision and Order (Dkt. 884 ) is AFFIRM ED. The Motion to Disburse Fines from Registry of the Court, Discharge Sanctions Order, and Vacate Sanctions Orders (Dkt. 866 ) is DENIED. The Orders imposing sanctions (Dkt. 352 , 408 , 531 ) are REINSTATED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 884 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movants are individually sanctioned in the amount of $6,000.00. Said amounts represent compensable costs to the Court as articulated herein. Separately, said amounts do not represent a ser ious sanction to which due process protections beyond notice and an opportunity to be heard apply. IT IS ADDITIONALLY HEREBY ORDERED that Movants Motion to (1) Disburse Fines from Registry of the Court; (2) Discharge Sanctions Order; and (3) Vacate Sanctions Orders (Docket No. 866 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (km)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 815 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. (ECF No. 737 ) and Motion for Summary Judgment by the Credit Suisse Defendants (ECF No. 741 ) are GRANTED as set forth herein. 2. The Motion for Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 805 ) is DENIED. 3. All other pending Motions are denied as moot. 4. The Clerk directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendants dismi ssing the Fifth Amended Complaint (ECF No. 644 ) and the claims therein with prejudice.IT IS SO ORDERED. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter this Order, enterJudgment in favor of Defendants as directed herein, furnish copies to counsel, and close this file. Signed by Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 753 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE Defendants' Motion to Strike, ECF 702 & 703 , is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER Credit Suisses Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Docket No. 551 ) is GRANTED. The previously-identified Plaintiffs' counsel, jointly and severally, shall pay $27,834.50 to Credit Suisse. Cushman & Wakefield' ;s Motion for Costs and Attorney Fees in Accordance with Sanctions Order (Docket No. 552 ) is GRANTED. The previously-identified Plaintiffs' counsel, jointly and severally, shall pay $29,903.50 to Cushman & Wakefield. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 673 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Docket No. 574 ) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement (Docket No. 658 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER The Motion to Stay (Dkt. 535 ) is GRANTED as follows: 1) The Order on Sanctions (Dkt. 531 ) is STAYED. 2) The Plaintiffs shall notify the Court within 5 days of the Ninth Circuit ruling on their Appeal and Petition for W rit of Mandamus. 3) The Motions for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 551 , 552 ) and remaining briefing deadlines on those Motions are STAYED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Report and Recommendation entered on7/31/14 (Dkt. 510 ), should be, and is hereby, INCORPORATED by reference andADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY. Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. [42 1]) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Dkt. 451 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are permitted to renew their Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint on or before 10/3/14. Plaintiffs' Motion to Take Judicial Notice (Dkt. 512 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant Cushman & Wakefield's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Douglas W. Haney and D. Michael Mason (Docket No. 434 ) is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: MOTION OF PHILIP STILLMAN ON HIS OWN BEHALFFOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATES MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS FILED ON 3/29/2013 352 denying 368 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Report and Recommendation entered on 8/16/13 (Dkt. 409 ), should be, and is hereby, INCORPORATED by reference and ADOPTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Dkt. 286 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Exclude (Dkt. 319 ) is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Judicial Notice (Dkt. 405 ) is MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Lender Agreement (Docket No. 410 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 253 Sealed Motion; denying 302 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 246 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 340 Motion to Enforce Court's Order of November 14, 2012, or, Alternatively, Extend Briefing Deadlines Re Plaintiffs' Renewed Confidentiality Motion re 336 MOTION to Lif t Improper Confidentiality Designation from Documents Produced by Defendants, Request for Sanctions, Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting in part and denying in part 342 Joinder. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Expedited Five-Page Brief Re: Order to Show Cause Hearing (Docket No. 308 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the requested five-page brief, with such brief due on or before 12/10/12. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Dismiss; (a) Plaintiffs Fraud Claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as alleged on behalf of a united class and, individually, as to Plaintiffs Jennings, Pushkin, LaFleur, Griffen, Land, and Dominguez. The Fraud Claim is NOT DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Gibson, Blixseth, and Koenig.b) Plaintiffs Negligent Misrepresentation Claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as alleged on behalf of a united class and, individual ly, as to Plaintiffs Jennings, Pushkin, LaFleur, Griffen, Land, and Dominguez. The Negligent Misrepresentation Claim is NOT DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Gibson, Blixseth, and Koenig. (c) Plaintiffs Tortious Interference and Negligence claims are NOTDI SMISSED. d) Plaintiffs Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Unjust Enrichment, and Consumer Protection Act Claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion to Dismiss; a) Plaintiffs Fraud Claim is DISMISSED with prejud ice as alleged on behalf of a united class and, individually, as to Plaintiffs Jennings, Mushkin, LaFleur, Griffen, Land, and Dominguez. The Fraud Claim is NOT DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Gibson, Blixseth, and Koenig. b) Plaintiffs Negligent Misrepres entation Claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as alleged on behalf of a united class and, individually, as to Plaintiffs Jennings, Mushkin, LaFleur, Griffen, Land, and Dominguez. The Negligent Misrepresentation Claim is NOT DISMISSED as to Plaintiffs Gi bson, Blixseth, and Koenig. c) Plaintiffs claims for Tortious Interference and Negligence as well as the Class Allegations are NOT DISMISSED. d) Plaintiffs Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Consumer Protection Act Claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. denying 159 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 130 Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Third Cause of Action (Docket No. 130) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS;Granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss,,,, filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities USA, LLC, Credit Suisse Cayman Islands Branch, Credit Suisse Fir st Boston Corp., Granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., 106 Report and Recommendations,,. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 80 Motion to Compel and Motion for Time Extension to File. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 52 & {55} Motion to Stay discovery; denying 57 Motion to convert; granting 69 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. Credit Suisse Securities USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. J. Gibson
Represented By: Philip H. Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Blixseth
Represented By: Philip H. Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Cayman Islands Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?