Pesky et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: |
Alan Pesky and Wendy Pesky |
Defendant: |
United States of America |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00186 |
Filed: |
April 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Boise - Southern Office |
County: |
Ada - Southern |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Lynn Winmill |
Nature of Suit: |
Taxes |
Cause of Action: |
26 U.S.C. § 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM ORDER the United States' motion for summary judgment on the Peskys' various claims for reimbursement that do not involve the Conservation Easement is GRANTED with respect to the Schedule C business deductions and various charitab le contributions, and DENIED with respect to reimbursement for contribution of stock to the Pesky Family Foundation, mortgage interest deductions, and miscellaneous itemized expenses. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss. The United States has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Counterclaim, if it can do so consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
|
August 29, 2011 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Compel 36 Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses, re: 52 Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM ORDER Re: Motion for a Determination of Conflict of Interest Issues- Defendant's motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?