Securities and Exchange Commission v. Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Securities and Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc, Donald L Gillispie, Jennifer Ransom, Bosco Financial, LLC and Energy Executive Consulting, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00621 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
Boise - Southern Office |
County: |
Ada - Southern |
Presiding Judge: |
Ronald E Bush |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward J. Lodge |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 77 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
284
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Approve Settlement and to Release Funds, or in the Alternative, to Deposit Funds with the Court (Docket No. 269) is DENIED; Defendant Alternate Energy Holdings , Inc.'s Motion to Approve Payment of Fees and Costs of Aldrich Law Firm, LTD. (Docket No. 271 ) is DENIED; and Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissions Motion to Strike Affidavit of John P. Aldrich (Docket No. 282 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. ((jp)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing
281
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- It is hereby ordered that the Report andRecommendation entered on 3/13/13 (Dkt. 242 ) is Adopted in Part and Rejected in Part as stated herein and the Court hereby orders as follows: 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Par tial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 166 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are granted summary judgment as to the First, Second, and Sixth causes of action. 2) Plaintiff's Motions for Order Freezing (Dkt. 219 , 258 ) and Motion and Objection RE: Order Freezing (Dkt. 265 ) are GRANTED. The funds currently held in escrow by Black & LoBello are hereby ordered to remain in that escrow account pending further order from this Court.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
264
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 258 Plaintiff's Renewed Request to Freeze Approximately $2 Million; granting 259 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
241
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 201 Motion to Strike ; granting 216 Motion to Supplement; granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting 222 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
165
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL granting 137 Motion to Compel, but only insofar as ordering Defendant to respond to the at-issue Requests for Production of Documents by May 8, 2012 and in a manner consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?