Produce Alliance, L.L.C. v. Sheppard Produce, Inc.

Plaintiff: Produce Alliance, L.L.C.
Defendant: Sheppard Produce Inc, Stanley R. Sheppard and Marilyn C. Sheppard
Case Number: 1:2011cv00243
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Twin Falls - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM DECISION. The Court will order Sheppard Transportation to place$36,483.65 in the PACA Trust Fund for distribution to the PACA creditors.The default judgment will run only against the Sheppard defendants and notagainst defendant D.L. E vans Bank. Because the dispute between the Bank and Produce Alliance continues, the default judgment will not close the case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER FOR THIRD INTERIM DISTRIBUTION granting 264 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/25/2013 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill; granting 239 MOTION for Order to Show Cause; 250 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive M otions. The dispositive motion deadline is stayed and will be reset following the Order to Show Cause hearing set forth above. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER FOR SECOND INTERM DISTRIBUTION granting 260 Motion for Second Interim Distribution. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying claims 149 Letter by Wholesome Family Farms, Inc, 33 Notice by Skinner Trucking Inc, 58 Declaration filed by Murakami Produce Co LLC, 63 Declaration filed by AmeriPride, 32 Notice filed by Sheppard Pr oduce Inc, 99 Declaration filed by M&M Heath Farms, Inc, 37 Declaration filed by McIver's Mobile Service, 29 Declaration filed by Jones Light Loads, LLC, 57 Declaration filed by Rocky Fence Vineyard Inc, 34 Notice filed by Sheppard T ransportation LLC, 38 Declaration filed by National Food Corporation, 40 Notice filed by Van Engelen CPA's & Co PLLC, 120 Notice filed by Sheppard Produce Inc for Herbthyme Farms, 75 Declaration filed by Frazier Melon, 28 Declaratio n filed by Diamond Towing, Inc, 35 Notice filed by Sheppard Produce Inc for S&G, 97 Declaration filed by Prescott, Inc. The following claims remain for resolution: 76 Intervenor Complaint filed by Spokane Produce, 92 Intevenor Complaint by Dubacano, and Wage Claims for dockets 71 , 72 , 73 , 74 , 87 , 98 , 100 . Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM DECISION. The Court will grant the motion for first interimdistribution and the motions to amend and substitute. The Court will issue a separate Order as the distribution is somewhat detailed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ADR Plan to be filed by 12/6/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2011. Discovery due by 2/3/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2011. Motions due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT INJUNCTION AND AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING PACA TRUST CLAIMS PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that after finding good cause for extending the TRO beyond the 14 day period permitted by Rule 65(b)(2), but not beyond 28 days, the TRO shall expire on June 23, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that a hearing shall be held on plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction on June 22, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise Idaho. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that defendants file a response to plaintiffs motion f or preliminary injunction on or before June 10, 2011, and that plaintiffs file a reply brief on or before June 17, 2011.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Alliance, L.L.C. v. Sheppard Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Alliance, L.L.C.
Represented By: Louis W Diess, III
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Patrick E Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheppard Produce Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley R. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn C. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?