Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan v. Hecla Mining Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan |
Defendant: |
Hecla Mining Company, Phillips S. Baker, Jr. and James A. Sabala |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00042 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Idaho |
Office: |
CDA - Northern Office |
County: |
Kootenai - Northern |
Presiding Judge: |
B. Lynn Winmill |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
105
JUDGMENT in accordance with the 104 Memorandum Decision and Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of defendants, and that this case be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
104
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting with leave to amend 92 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before 10/18/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER denying (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (18) Motion ; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (21) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:1 2-cv-00042-BLW; denying (22) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (18) Motion ; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases i n case 2:12-cv-00067-BLW. Institutional Investors shall be the lead plaintiffs, and their counsel shall be appointed lead counsel.Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 2:12-cv-00042-BLW, 2:12-cv-00067-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?